US HB1590 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on October 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-09 - Became Public Law No: 116-64. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on October 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-09 - Became Public Law No: 116-64. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Department of Homeland Security to develop and conduct an exercise related to the detection and prevention of terrorist and foreign fighter travel. The bill requires the national exercise program (a program to test and evaluate the national preparedness goal, National Incident Management System, National Response Plan, and other related plans and strategies) to include emerging threats.
Title
Terrorist and Foreign Fighter Travel Exercise Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Guest [R-MS] | Rep. Trent Kelly [R-MS] | Rep. Michael McCaul [R-TX] | Rep. Clay Higgins [R-LA] |
Rep. Steven Palazzo [R-MS] | Rep. Mark Walker [R-NC] | Rep. John Ratcliffe [R-TX] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-01 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended RC# 138 (Y: 394 N: 7 NV: 30 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-09 | House | Became Public Law No: 116-64. (TXT | PDF) |
2019-10-09 | House | Signed by President. |
2019-09-27 | House | Presented to President. |
2019-09-25 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2019-09-24 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5669) |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 109. |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson without amendment. With written report No. 116-44. |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
2019-04-01 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-04-01 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 394 - 7 (Roll no. 138). (text: CR H2930) |
2019-04-01 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H2933-2934) |
2019-04-01 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2019-04-01 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1590. |
2019-04-01 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2930-2931) |
2019-04-01 | House | Mr. Thompson (MS) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2019-03-28 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 13. |
2019-03-28 | House | Reported by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 116-27. |
2019-03-13 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2019-03-13 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Homeland Security. |
2019-03-07 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Congressional oversight
Emergency management
Emergency planning and evacuation
Homeland security
Terrorism
Travel and tourism
Emergency management
Emergency planning and evacuation
Homeland security
Terrorism
Travel and tourism