US HB1593 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-02 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-02 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes in the Department of Homeland Security a council to ensure the coordination of activities, plans, and policies to enhance the security of schools and preschools against acts of terrorism.
Title
CLASS Act of 2019 Coordinating and Leveraging Activities for School Security Act
Sponsors
Rep. Donald Payne [D-NJ] | Rep. Bennie Thompson [D-MS] | Rep. Al Green [D-TX] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-01 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended RC# 137 (Y: 384 N: 18 NV: 29 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-02 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
2019-04-01 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-04-01 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 384 - 18 (Roll no. 137). (text: CR H2929) |
2019-04-01 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H2933) |
2019-04-01 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2019-04-01 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1593. |
2019-04-01 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2929-2930) |
2019-04-01 | House | Mr. Thompson (MS) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2019-03-28 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 11. |
2019-03-28 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 116-25. |
2019-03-13 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent. |
2019-03-13 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Homeland Security. |
2019-03-07 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB8791 (Related) 2020-11-20 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management.
Subjects
Congressional oversight
Crime prevention
Elementary and secondary education
Emergency management
Intergovernmental relations
Preschool education
School administration
Terrorism
Crime prevention
Elementary and secondary education
Emergency management
Intergovernmental relations
Preschool education
School administration
Terrorism