US HB1600 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Commodity Exchanges, Energy, and Credit.
Pending: House Commodity Exchanges, Energy, and Credit Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Commodity Exchanges, Energy, and Credit.
Pending: House Commodity Exchanges, Energy, and Credit Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Redirects Department of Transportation funds previously intended for high-speed rail development in California to the Department of the Interior. Such funds shall be available for various existing water-storage and wastewater-disposal programs and new water-related grant programs.
Title
Repurposing Assets to Increase Long-term Water Availability and Yield Act
Sponsors
Rep. Kevin McCarthy [R-CA] | Rep. Ken Calvert [R-CA] | Rep. Paul Cook [R-CA] | Rep. Duncan Hunter [R-CA] |
Rep. Doug LaMalfa [R-CA] | Rep. Tom McClintock [R-CA] | Rep. Devin Nunes [R-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-26 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Commodity Exchanges, Energy, and Credit. |
2019-04-16 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife. |
2019-03-08 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment. |
2019-03-08 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials. |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to the Committee on Agriculture, and in addition to the Committees on Transportation and Infrastructure, and Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to the Committee on Agriculture, and in addition to the Committees on Transportation and Infrastructure, and Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to the Committee on Agriculture, and in addition to the Committees on Transportation and Infrastructure, and Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-03-07 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB5217 (Related) 2019-12-11 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.
Subjects
California
Department of Agriculture
Department of the Interior
Executive agency funding and structure
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Railroads
Rural conditions and development
Transportation programs funding
Water quality
Water resources development
Water resources funding
Water storage
Water use and supply
Department of Agriculture
Department of the Interior
Executive agency funding and structure
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Railroads
Rural conditions and development
Transportation programs funding
Water quality
Water resources development
Water resources funding
Water storage
Water use and supply
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/1600/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr1600/BILLS-116hr1600ih.pdf |