US HB1603 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 49-1)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-19 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 47 - 1.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-19 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 47 - 1.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits the manufacturing, processing, and distribution of asbestos or any mixture or article containing asbestos. The bill authorizes the President to grant exemptions from this prohibition if it is necessary to protect national security interests and no feasible alternative exists for the intended use of the asbestos-containing product. Any person who has manufactured, processed, or distributed asbestos or any mixture or article containing asbestos in the 36 months preceding the enactment of this bill (as well as those acting within the year after enactment but before the prohibition takes effect) must submit a report to the Environmental Protection Agency (EPA) including information such as the location of the facility where the manufacturing occurred. Additionally, the EPA must submit a report assessing the presence of asbestos in any residential, commercial, industrial, public, and school buildings as well as the extent of exposure and risk to human health. The report must include recommendations for modifications or additions to statutes, regulations, policies, and programs aimed at protecting against exposures to legacy asbestos.
Title
Alan Reinstein Ban Asbestos Now Act of 2019
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-19 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 47 - 1. |
2019-11-19 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-09-26 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote . |
2019-09-26 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-05-13 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2019-05-01 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2019-03-08 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment and Climate Change. |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-03-07 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB717 (Related) 2019-03-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Building construction
Business records
Congressional oversight
Environmental health
Environmental protection
Environmental Protection Agency (EPA)
Environmental regulatory procedures
Government information and archives
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Manufacturing
Solid waste and recycling
Building construction
Business records
Congressional oversight
Environmental health
Environmental protection
Environmental Protection Agency (EPA)
Environmental regulatory procedures
Government information and archives
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Manufacturing
Solid waste and recycling
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/1603/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr1603/BILLS-116hr1603ih.pdf |