US HB1608 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-13 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-13 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions regarding federal advisory committees, including to (1) require designation of committee members as special government employees or representatives, (2) apply the Federal Advisory Committee Act (FACA) to subcommittees and subgroups, and (3) require publication of certain information about advisory committees. The bill requires appointments to advisory committees to be made without regard to political affiliation or campaign activity, unless required by federal statute. Each agency, prior to appointing members to an advisory committee, must solicit nominations for potential committee members. The agency shall solicit nominations at least once every two years. The bill provides statutory authority for the designation of advisory committee members as special government employees (if they are appointed to exercise their individual best judgement) or representatives (if they are appointed to represent a nongovernment entity). Agencies may not designate committee members as representatives to avoid federal ethics rules. Each agency shall make available on its website specified information about each of the agency's advisory committees, including membership, meeting minutes, and notices of future meetings. The General Services Administration must also publish this information. The bill revises requirements for Advisory Committee Management Officers, including to require them to be senior officials with expertise in implementing FACA. The Government Accountability Office shall report on agency compliance with FACA.
Title
Federal Advisory Committee Act Amendments of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Lacy Clay [D-MO] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-13 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
2019-03-12 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-03-12 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H2667-2670) |
2019-03-12 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1608. |
2019-03-12 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2667-2671) |
2019-03-12 | House | Ms. Norton moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to the Committee on Oversight and Reform, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, and the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to the Committee on Oversight and Reform, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, and the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to the Committee on Oversight and Reform, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, and the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-03-07 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1220 (Related) 2019-04-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Subjects
Advisory bodies
Congressional oversight
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Government information and archives
Government operations and politics
Government studies and investigations
Political parties and affiliation
Congressional oversight
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Government information and archives
Government operations and politics
Government studies and investigations
Political parties and affiliation