US HB1612 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
Pending: House Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Nonpartisan Bill For the People Act of 2019

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Nonpartisan Bill For the People Act of 2019

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-12HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
2019-04-03HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Cybersecurity, Infrastructure Protection, and Innovation.
2019-03-07HouseReferred to the Committee on House Administration, and in addition to the Committees on Science, Space, and Technology, the Judiciary, Homeland Security, Intelligence (Permanent Select), Ways and Means, Financial Services, Oversight and Reform, and Ethics, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-03-07HouseReferred to the Committee on House Administration, and in addition to the Committees on Science, Space, and Technology, the Judiciary, Homeland Security, Intelligence (Permanent Select), Ways and Means, Financial Services, Oversight and Reform, and Ethics, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-03-07HouseReferred to the Committee on House Administration, and in addition to the Committees on Science, Space, and Technology, the Judiciary, Homeland Security, Intelligence (Permanent Select), Ways and Means, Financial Services, Oversight and Reform, and Ethics, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-03-07HouseReferred to the Committee on House Administration, and in addition to the Committees on Science, Space, and Technology, the Judiciary, Homeland Security, Intelligence (Permanent Select), Ways and Means, Financial Services, Oversight and Reform, and Ethics, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-03-07HouseReferred to the Committee on House Administration, and in addition to the Committees on Science, Space, and Technology, the Judiciary, Homeland Security, Intelligence (Permanent Select), Ways and Means, Financial Services, Oversight and Reform, and Ethics, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-03-07HouseReferred to the Committee on House Administration, and in addition to the Committees on Science, Space, and Technology, the Judiciary, Homeland Security, Intelligence (Permanent Select), Ways and Means, Financial Services, Oversight and Reform, and Ethics, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-03-07HouseReferred to the Committee on House Administration, and in addition to the Committees on Science, Space, and Technology, the Judiciary, Homeland Security, Intelligence (Permanent Select), Ways and Means, Financial Services, Oversight and Reform, and Ethics, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-03-07HouseReferred to the Committee on House Administration, and in addition to the Committees on Science, Space, and Technology, the Judiciary, Homeland Security, Intelligence (Permanent Select), Ways and Means, Financial Services, Oversight and Reform, and Ethics, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-03-07HouseReferred to the Committee on House Administration, and in addition to the Committees on Science, Space, and Technology, the Judiciary, Homeland Security, Intelligence (Permanent Select), Ways and Means, Financial Services, Oversight and Reform, and Ethics, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-03-07HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB273 (Similar To) 2019-01-08 - Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB26 (Related) 2019-01-03 - Referred to the Committee on House Administration, and in addition to the Committee on Oversight and Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB44 (Related) 2019-01-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
HB129 (Related) 2019-01-03 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
HB160 (Related) 2019-01-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
HB209 (Related) 2019-01-30 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H1320)
HB391 (Related) 2019-06-12 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 23 - 16.
HB599 (Related) 2019-02-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
HB736 (Related) 2019-01-23 - Referred to the Committee on Oversight and Reform, and in addition to the Committee on House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB745 (Related) 2019-03-26 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 18 - 15.
HB783 (Related) 2019-03-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
HB842 (Related) 2019-01-29 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
HB964 (Related) 2019-03-26 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 18 - 12.
HB1272 (Related) 2019-02-14 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
HB1382 (Related) 2019-03-14 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H2733)
HB1467 (Related) 2019-04-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
HB1573 (Related) 2019-03-06 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
HR157 (Related) 2019-02-28 - Referred to the House Committee on Ethics.
SB74 (Related) 2019-01-10 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
SB547 (Related) 2019-02-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
SB949 (Related) 2019-03-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB195 (Related) 2019-04-10 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 67.
SB1356 (Related) 2019-05-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
SB1147 (Related) 2019-04-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.

US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback