US HB1616 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-26 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-26 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the Department of State to prioritize assistance to develop energy infrastructure in Europe and Eurasia, in particular for projects involving the European Commission and countries in the region. Assistance shall include political and diplomatic support and funding assistance. Projects eligible for such assistance include infrastructure for natural gas, electricity transmission, and renewable energy. The State Department shall give preference to projects that (1) improve the capacity to transfer gas and electricity within and between regional countries, (2) have been identified by the European Commission as integral for regional energy security, (3) are expected to enhance energy market integration and transparency, (4) can attract other sources of funding, and (5) can potentially use U.S. goods and services. The President shall report to Congress annually about U.S. assistance provided under this bill.
Title
European Energy Security and Diversification Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Adam Kinzinger [R-IL] | Rep. William Keating [D-MA] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. Vicente Gonzalez [D-TX] |
Rep. Brad Sherman [D-CA] | Rep. Joe Wilson [R-SC] | Rep. Ron Wright [R-TX] | Rep. Gregory Pence [R-IN] |
Rep. Marcy Kaptur [D-OH] | Rep. Richard Hudson [R-NC] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-25 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended RC# 126 (Y: 391 N: 24 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-26 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. |
2019-03-25 | House | The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection. |
2019-03-25 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-03-25 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 391 - 24 (Roll no. 126). (text: CR H2771-2772) |
2019-03-25 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H2780-2781) |
2019-03-25 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2019-03-25 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1616. |
2019-03-25 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2771-2773) |
2019-03-25 | House | Mr. Sires moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2019-03-14 | House | Committee Agreed to Seek Consideration Under Suspension of the Rules. |
2019-03-14 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2019-03-14 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
2019-03-07 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB1453 (Related) 2019-02-28 - Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
SB704 (Same As) 2019-12-17 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 331.
SB704 (Same As) 2019-12-17 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 331.
Subjects
Alternative and renewable resources
Asia
Business investment and capital
Collective security
Competition and antitrust
Congressional oversight
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Economic performance and conditions
Electric power generation and transmission
Energy storage, supplies, demand
Environmental regulatory procedures
Europe
Foreign aid and international relief
International affairs
International organizations and cooperation
Multilateral development programs
Oil and gas
Public-private cooperation
Russia
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
Asia
Business investment and capital
Collective security
Competition and antitrust
Congressional oversight
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Economic performance and conditions
Electric power generation and transmission
Energy storage, supplies, demand
Environmental regulatory procedures
Europe
Foreign aid and international relief
International affairs
International organizations and cooperation
Multilateral development programs
Oil and gas
Public-private cooperation
Russia
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status