US HB1618 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Engrossed on September 18 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-09-18 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Nicholas and Zachary Burt Carbon Monoxide Poisoning Prevention Act of 2019 This bill directs the Consumer Product Safety Commission to establish a grant program to provide assistance to states for specified activities related to the prevention of carbon monoxide poisoning, including installation of alarms in certain dwellings and facilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Nicholas and Zachary Burt Carbon Monoxide Poisoning Prevention Act of 2019

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-18SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
2019-09-17HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2019-09-17HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7723-7724)
2019-09-17HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7723-7727)
2019-09-17HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1618.
2019-09-17HouseMs. Schakowsky moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
2019-09-16HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 165.
2019-09-16HouseCommittee on House Administration discharged.
2019-09-16HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 116-208, Part I.
2019-07-17HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
2019-07-17HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-07-10HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote .
2019-07-10HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-06-13HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
2019-03-08HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Consumer Protection and Commerce.
2019-03-07HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-03-07HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-03-07HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB481 (Related) 2019-11-13 - Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback