US HB1628 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-01 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-01 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Department of Veterans Affairs to seek to enter an agreement with the National Academies of Sciences, Engineering, and Medicine to conduct a study and report on the level of radiation exposure experienced by members of the Armed Forces who participated in the cleanup of Enewetak Atoll between January 1, 1977, and December 31, 1980.
Title
Enewetak Atoll Cleanup Radiation Study Act
Sponsors
Rep. Greg Steube [R-FL] | Rep. Elaine Luria [D-VA] | Rep. Tom McClintock [R-CA] | Rep. Ed Case [D-HI] |
Rep. Ron Kind [D-WI] | Rep. Collin Peterson [D-MN] | Rep. Michael Waltz [R-FL] | Rep. Tim Ryan [D-OH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-01 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2019-04-30 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs. |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2019-03-07 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Congressional oversight
Government studies and investigations
Marshall Islands
Military personnel and dependents
Military procurement, research, weapons development
Nuclear weapons
Oceania
Radioactive wastes and releases
Congressional oversight
Government studies and investigations
Marshall Islands
Military personnel and dependents
Military procurement, research, weapons development
Nuclear weapons
Oceania
Radioactive wastes and releases
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/1628/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr1628/BILLS-116hr1628ih.pdf |