US HB1632 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Engrossed on September 25 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-09-25 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 25 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-09-25 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the Department of State to submit to Congress a strategy for engagement with Southeast Asia and the Association of Southeast Asian Nations (ASEAN). The strategy shall include various elements including (1) an identification of enduring U.S. interests in the region and efforts to bolster ASEAN's effectiveness; (2) a list of ongoing and planned initiatives to strengthen U.S. relationships in the region, including efforts to promote inclusive economic growth and to combat climate change; and (3) a summary of ongoing efforts to promote human rights and democracy and strengthen the rule of law.
Title
Southeast Asia Strategy Act
Sponsors
Rep. Ann Wagner [R-MO] | Rep. Joaquin Castro [D-TX] | Rep. Ted Yoho [R-FL] | Rep. Mark Meadows [R-NC] |
Rep. Brian Mast [R-FL] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. Brad Sherman [D-CA] | Rep. Joe Wilson [R-SC] |
Rep. Dean Phillips [D-MN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-25 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. |
2019-09-24 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-09-24 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7875) |
2019-09-24 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1632. |
2019-09-24 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7875-7877) |
2019-09-24 | House | Mr. Levin (MI) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2019-06-20 | House | Committee Agreed to Seek Consideration Under Suspension of the Rules. |
2019-06-20 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2019-06-20 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-03-25 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Asia, the Pacific and Nonproliferation. |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
2019-03-07 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Alliances
ASEAN countries
Asia
Brunei
Burma
Cambodia
Collective security
Congressional oversight
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Economic development
Human rights
Human trafficking
Indonesia
Infrastructure development
International affairs
International organizations and cooperation
Laos
Malaysia
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Navigation, waterways, harbors
Pacific Ocean
Philippines
Public-private cooperation
Rule of law and government transparency
Singapore
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
Terrorism
Thailand
Transportation safety and security
Vietnam
ASEAN countries
Asia
Brunei
Burma
Cambodia
Collective security
Congressional oversight
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Economic development
Human rights
Human trafficking
Indonesia
Infrastructure development
International affairs
International organizations and cooperation
Laos
Malaysia
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Navigation, waterways, harbors
Pacific Ocean
Philippines
Public-private cooperation
Rule of law and government transparency
Singapore
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
Terrorism
Thailand
Transportation safety and security
Vietnam