US HB1646 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 83-7)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-09-21 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

HERO Act Helping Emergency Responders Overcome Act This bill establishes a series of programs relating to the behavioral health of public-safety officers (e.g., law-enforcement officers, firefighters, ambulance crew members, and 9-1-1 operators). For example, the bill establishes (1) a public-safety officer suicide-reporting system at the Centers for Disease Control and Prevention, and (2) a grant program for peer-support behavioral health and wellness programs within fire departments and emergency medical services agencies.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

HERO Act Helping Emergency Responders Overcome Act

Sponsors

Rep. Ami Bera [D-CA]Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA]Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX]Rep. Christopher Pappas [D-NH]
Rep. Brad Sherman [D-CA]Rep. Harley Rouda [D-CA]Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA]Rep. David Loebsack [D-IA]
Rep. Ed Perlmutter [D-CO]Rep. Jared Golden [D-ME]Rep. Debbie Wasserman Schultz [D-FL]Rep. Jimmy Panetta [D-CA]
Rep. John Garamendi [D-CA]Rep. Norma Torres [D-CA]Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA]Rep. Peter Welch [D-VT]
Rep. Madeleine Dean [D-PA]Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL]Rep. Salud Carbajal [D-CA]Rep. Raul Ruiz [D-CA]
Rep. Peter Visclosky [D-IN]Rep. Elise Stefanik [R-NY]Rep. Tom Malinowski [D-NJ]Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI]
Rep. Bill Posey [R-FL]Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR]Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH]Rep. Mark Pocan [D-WI]
Rep. Lisa Rochester [D-DE]Rep. Ben McAdams [D-UT]Rep. Theodore Deutch [D-FL]Rep. Tulsi Gabbard [D-HI]
Rep. Tom O'Halleran [D-AZ]Rep. Haley Stevens [D-MI]Rep. Seth Moulton [D-MA]Rep. Josh Harder [D-CA]
Rep. Juan Vargas [D-CA]Rep. Katherine Clark [D-MA]Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA]Rep. Ruben Gallego [D-AZ]
Rep. Filemon Vela [D-TX]Rep. Conor Lamb [D-PA]Rep. Dina Titus [D-NV]Rep. Sharice Davids [D-KS]
Rep. Collin Peterson [D-MN]Rep. Ron Kind [D-WI]Rep. Denny Heck [D-WA]Rep. Susan Wild [D-PA]
Rep. James Himes [D-CT]Rep. Anthony Brindisi [D-NY]Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR]Rep. Stephanie Murphy [D-FL]
Rep. Susan Brooks [R-IN]Rep. Daniel Kildee [D-MI]Rep. Paul Tonko [D-NY]Rep. Kurt Schrader [D-OR]
Rep. Julia Brownley [D-CA]Rep. Angela Craig [D-MN]Rep. Jennifer Wexton [D-VA]Rep. Emanuel Cleaver [D-MO]
Rep. Elissa Slotkin [D-MI]Rep. David Roe [R-TN]Rep. Bill Pascrell [D-NJ]Rep. Suzanne Lee [D-NV]
Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD]Rep. Kendra Horn [D-OK]Rep. Cindy Axne [D-IA]Rep. Charlie Crist [D-FL]
Rep. David Trone [D-MD]Rep. Ben Lujan [D-NM]Rep. Greg Stanton [D-AZ]Rep. Abby Finkenauer [D-IA]
Rep. Robin Kelly [D-IL]Rep. Antonio Delgado [D-NY]Rep. Josh Gottheimer [D-NJ]Rep. Mike Thompson [D-CA]
Rep. Ilhan Omar [D-MN]Rep. Andy Kim [D-NJ]Rep. Joseph Neguse [D-CO]Rep. Sean Maloney [D-NY]
Rep. Jackie Walorski [R-IN]Rep. Jeff Van Drew [D-NJ]Rep. Tim Ryan [D-OH]Rep. Steven Horsford [D-NV]
Rep. Ed Case [D-HI]Rep. Eddie Johnson [D-TX]Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN]Rep. Bill Foster [D-IL]
Rep. Michael Burgess [R-TX]Rep. Mike Levin [D-CA]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-21HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2020-09-21HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
2020-09-21HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1646.
2020-09-21HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules.
2020-09-21HouseMrs. Dingell moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
2020-09-18HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 419.
2020-09-18HouseCommittee on Science, Space, and Technology discharged.
2020-09-18HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 116-519, Part I.
2020-07-15HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
2020-07-15HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2020-06-30HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
2019-03-09HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
2019-03-08HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Research and Technology.
2019-03-08HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-03-08HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-03-08HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB3244 (Related) 2020-01-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback