US HB1649 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on July 16 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-07-16 - Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 150.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 16 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-07-16 - Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 150.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Small Business Administration to establish a program for certifying at least 5 or 10% of the total number of employees of a small business development center to provide cybersecurity planning assistance to small businesses.
Title
Small Business Development Center Cyber Training Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Steve Chabot [R-OH] | Rep. Dwight Evans [D-PA] | Rep. Nydia Velazquez [D-NY] | Rep. Troy Balderson [R-OH] |
Rep. Chrissy Houlahan [D-PA] | Rep. Pete Stauber [R-MN] | Rep. Angela Craig [D-MN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-16 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 150. |
2019-07-15 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-07-15 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5809) |
2019-07-15 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1649. |
2019-07-15 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5809-5810) |
2019-07-15 | House | Mr. Delgado moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2019-06-13 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 81. |
2019-06-13 | House | Reported by the Committee on Small Business. H. Rept. 116-112. |
2019-03-08 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Small Business. |
2019-03-08 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB771 (Related) 2019-04-01 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 51.
HB2500 (Related) 2020-08-11 - Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 512.
HB2500 (Related) 2020-08-11 - Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 512.
Subjects
Business education
Commerce
Computer security and identity theft
Licensing and registrations
Small business
Commerce
Computer security and identity theft
Licensing and registrations
Small business