US HB1662 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-06-03 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-06-03 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Anthony DeJuan Boatwright Act - Amends the Child Care and Development Block Grant Act of 1990 to require a state to include as part of its regulatory process for issuance and renewal of licenses to providers of child care services, a recommendation to each provider that it carry current liability insurance. Requires state plans for the use of child care and development block grant funds to certify that there are in effect state or local health and safety requirements that each child care provider: (1) post publicly and conspicuously in the service area of its premises a notice specifying whether it carries current liability insurance; and (2) give written notice to parents about whether it carries such insurance, obtain the signature of at least one parent per child acknowledging receipt of such notice, and maintain records of such signed notice while a child receives services.
Title
Anthony DeJuan Boatwright Act
Sponsors
Rep. Gary Ackerman [D-NY] | Rep. Joe Baca [D-CA] | Rep. John Barrow [D-GA] | Rep. Sanford Bishop [D-GA] |
Rep. Dan Boren [D-OK] | Rep. Corrine Brown [D-FL] | Rep. G. Butterfield [D-NC] | Rep. Russ Carnahan [D-MO] |
Rep. Christopher Carney [D-PA] | Rep. Travis Childers [D-MS] | Rep. Emanuel Cleaver [D-MO] | Rep. Lincoln Davis [D-TN] |
Sen. Joe Donnelly [D-IN] | Rep. Keith Ellison [D-MN] | Rep. Charles Gonzalez [D-TX] | Rep. John Hall [D-NY] |
Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL] | Rep. Maurice Hinchey [D-NY] | Rep. Rush Holt [D-NJ] | Rep. Steve Israel [D-NY] |
Rep. Henry Johnson [D-GA] | Rep. Walter Jones [R-NC] | Rep. Carolyn McCarthy [D-NY] | Rep. Jerry McNerney [D-CA] |
Rep. Brad Miller [D-NC] | Rep. Alan Mollohan [D-WV] | Rep. Ed Perlmutter [D-CO] | Rep. Bobby Rush [D-IL] |
Rep. David Scott [D-GA] | Rep. Heath Shuler [D-NC] | Rep. Ellen Tauscher [D-CA] | Rep. Debbie Wasserman Schultz [D-FL] |
Rep. Anthony Weiner [D-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-03 | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. | |
2009-06-02 | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. | |
2009-06-02 | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6034) | |
2009-06-02 | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1662. | |
2009-06-02 | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6034-6036) | |
2009-06-02 | Mr. Tonko moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. | |
2009-05-14 | Referred to the Subcommittee on Early Childhood, Elementary, and Secondary Education. | |
2009-03-23 | Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1465 (Related) 2009-07-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Subjects
Business records
Child care and development
Consumer affairs
Families
Licensing and registrations
Life, casualty, property insurance
State and local government operations
Child care and development
Consumer affairs
Families
Licensing and registrations
Life, casualty, property insurance
State and local government operations