US HB1662 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 21 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-11-16 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 806.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 21 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-11-16 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 806.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend title 38, United States Code, to prohibit smoking in any facility of the Veterans Health Administration, and for other purposes. This bill prohibits smoking: (1) indoors in any Veterans Health Administration facility, and (2) outdoors in any such facility as of October 1, 2022. The bill repeals a provision authorizing the Department of Veterans Affairs to furnish tobacco to veterans receiving hospital or domiciliary care.
Title
To amend title 38, United States Code, to prohibit smoking in any facility of the Veterans Health Administration, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Brad Wenstrup [R-OH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-11-16 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 806. |
2018-11-16 | House | Reported by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 115-1033. |
2017-05-17 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2017-05-17 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-04-06 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote . |
2017-03-29 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2017-03-29 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2017-03-21 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2017-03-21 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2119 (Related) 2017-11-13 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. (text of measure as introduced: CR S7178)
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Department of Veterans Affairs
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Health facilities and institutions
Veterans' medical care
Department of Veterans Affairs
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Health facilities and institutions
Veterans' medical care