US HB1663 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on November 14 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-11-14 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 14 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-11-14 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Revises the federal charter for the Foundation of the Federal Bar Association. Specifically, it makes the following changes: eliminates the provision that requires the foundation to be incorporated and domiciled in the District of Columbia; requires the board of directors to decide, and specify in the bylaws, the location of the principal office; specifies that the bylaws—not the charter—must provide for the terms of membership, the responsibilities of the board of directors, and the election of officers; prohibits a director or officer, in his or her corporate capacity, from contributing to, supporting, or participating in political activities; allows income and assets of the corporation to be used to reasonably compensate or reimburse expenses of an officer, director, or member; to award a grant to the Federal Bar Association chapter of an officer, director, or member; and to reasonably compensate employees; expands a prohibition on loans for directors and officers to include members and employees; and specifies that on dissolution or final liquidation, any remaining assets must be distributed as provided by the board of directors instead of deposited in the Treasury.
Title
Foundation of the Federal Bar Association Charter Amendments Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Steve Chabot [R-OH] | Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-14 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
2019-11-13 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-11-13 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8794) |
2019-11-13 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1663. |
2019-11-13 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8794-8796) |
2019-11-13 | House | Mr. Raskin moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2019-04-08 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship. |
2019-03-11 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2019-03-11 | House | Introduced in House |