US HB1690 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-0)
Status: Engrossed on September 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-09-11 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-09-11 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the installation of carbon monoxide detectors in each unit of specified federally assisted housing, in accordance with certain standards. Specifically, the requirement applies to (1) supportive housing for the elderly and for persons with disabilities, (2) public housing, (3) rental housing for which the owner receives low-income voucher assistance, (4) housing for individuals with AIDS, and (5) certain rural housing. The Department of Housing and Urban Development (HUD) must provide guidance to public housing agencies on how to educate tenants on health hazards in the home. HUD must also report on the inclusion of carbon monoxide detectors in federally assisted housing not covered by the bill.
Title
CO ALERTS Act of 2019 Carbon Monoxide Alarms Leading Every Resident To Safety Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Jesus Garcia [D-IL] | Rep. Joe Cunningham [D-SC] | Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI] | Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY] |
Rep. Nydia Velazquez [D-NY] | Rep. Sean Maloney [D-NY] | Rep. Lacy Clay [D-MO] | Rep. Rashida Tlaib [D-MI] |
Rep. James Clyburn [D-SC] | Rep. Marcia Fudge [D-OH] | Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] | Rep. Max Rose [D-NY] |
Rep. James McGovern [D-MA] | Rep. Rosa DeLauro [D-CT] | Rep. David Scott [D-GA] | Rep. Cheri Bustos [D-IL] |
Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA] | Rep. Eddie Johnson [D-TX] | Rep. Jerrold Nadler [D-NY] | Rep. Ayanna Pressley [D-MA] |
Rep. Val Demings [D-FL] | Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX] | Rep. Lucy McBath [D-GA] | Rep. Joseph Neguse [D-CO] |
Rep. Bennie Thompson [D-MS] | Rep. Danny Davis [D-IL] | Rep. Debra Haaland [D-NM] | Rep. Alexandria Ocasio-Cortez [D-NY] |
Rep. Carolyn Maloney [D-NY] | Rep. Emanuel Cleaver [D-MO] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-11 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. |
2019-09-10 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-09-10 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7581-7582) |
2019-09-10 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1690. |
2019-09-10 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7581-7583) |
2019-09-10 | House | Mr. San Nicolas moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2019-06-26 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2019-03-12 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services. |
2019-03-12 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB755 (Related) 2019-03-12 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
SB2160 (Related) 2019-11-07 - Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 116-125.
SB2160 (Related) 2019-11-07 - Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 116-125.
Subjects
Air quality
Emergency communications systems
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
HIV/AIDS
Housing and community development
Housing for the elderly and disabled
Housing industry and standards
Low- and moderate-income housing
Product safety and quality
Public housing
Emergency communications systems
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
HIV/AIDS
Housing and community development
Housing for the elderly and disabled
Housing industry and standards
Low- and moderate-income housing
Product safety and quality
Public housing