US HB1693 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-23 - Referred to the House Committee on Small Business.
Pending: House Small Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-23 - Referred to the House Committee on Small Business.
Pending: House Small Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Improving Contract Procurement for Small Businesses through More Accurate Reporting Act of 2017 This bill amends the Small Business Act to require the Small Business Administration to report to the President and Congress an analysis of the number and dollar amount of prime contracts awarded by federal agencies each fiscal year to small business concerns, including those: owned and controlled by service-disabled veterans; located in qualified HUBZones; owned and controlled by socially and economically disadvantaged individuals; owned by an Indian tribe, an Alaska Native Corporation, or a Native Hawaiian Organization; or owned and controlled by women. The analyses shall cover all such small business concerns: that were purchased by another entity after the initial contract was awarded and as a result would no longer be deemed to be small business concerns for purposes of the initial contract, and that were awarded using a procurement method that restricted competition to the kinds of small business concerns listed here or a subset of any of them.
Title
Improving Contract Procurement for Small Businesses through More Accurate Reporting Act of 2017
Sponsors
Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] |
Roll Calls
Senate - On the Cloture Motion S.Amdt. 1003 to H.R. 2810 (National Defense Authorization Act for Fiscal Year 2018) (Y: 84 N: 9 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - On Cloture on the Motion to Proceed H.R. 2810 (Y: 89 N: 3 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - On Cloture on the Motion to Proceed H.R. 2810 (Y: 89 N: 3 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-23 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Small Business. |
2017-03-23 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB1773 (Related) 2017-03-29 - Referred to the House Committee on Small Business.
HB2810 (Related) 2017-12-12 - Became Public Law No: 115-91. (TXT | PDF)
HR616 (Similar To) 2017-11-14 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB2810 (Related) 2017-12-12 - Became Public Law No: 115-91. (TXT | PDF)
HR616 (Similar To) 2017-11-14 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Alaska Natives and Hawaiians
Commerce
Congressional oversight
Economic development
Government studies and investigations
Minority and disadvantaged businesses
Public contracts and procurement
Small business
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Women in business
Commerce
Congressional oversight
Economic development
Government studies and investigations
Minority and disadvantaged businesses
Public contracts and procurement
Small business
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Women in business