US HB1716 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-6)
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Coastal Communities Ocean Acidification Act of 2019 This bill requires the National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration (NOAA) to conduct and update at least once every seven years an ocean acidification coastal community vulnerability assessment with a corresponding public report. The assessment must identify (1) U.S. coastal communities that are most dependent on coastal and ocean resources that may be impacted by ocean acidification; (2) the nature of those communities' vulnerabilities, including the economic impact on local or regional commercial fisheries and recreational opportunities; and (3) key knowledge gaps where research could be devoted to better understand the possible ocean acidification impacts and possible adaptation strategies for the communities. In carrying out the assessment, NOAA must collaborate with state, U.S. territory, local, and tribal government entities that are conducting or have completed vulnerability assessments, strategic research planning, or other similar activities related to ocean acidification to determine whether those activities may serve as a model for others and to identify opportunities for federal agencies to support those activities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Coastal Communities Ocean Acidification Act of 2019

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-10SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
2019-06-05HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2019-06-05HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4325-4326)
2019-06-05HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1716.
2019-06-05HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4325-4327)
2019-06-05HouseMs. Johnson (TX) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
2019-05-23HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 56.
2019-05-23HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology. H. Rept. 116-81.
2019-05-01HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
2019-05-01HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-04-09HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
2019-04-09HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-03-13HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Environment.
2019-03-13HouseReferred to the House Committee on Science, Space, and Technology.
2019-03-13HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB778 (Related) 2019-03-13 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback