US HB1727 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on March 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-22 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-22 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows a tax credit for the fair market value of any National Scenic Trail conservation contribution. The Department of the Interior must study and report on the efficacy of the tax credit in completing, extending, and increasing the number of National Scenic Trails and the feasibility and cost of making the credit refundable and transferable.
Title
Complete America’s Great Trails Act
Sponsors
Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA] | Rep. Paul Tonko [D-NY] | Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR] | Rep. Scott Peters [D-CA] |
Rep. James McGovern [D-MA] | Rep. Matthew Cartwright [D-PA] | Rep. Suzanne Bonamici [D-OR] | Rep. Ed Case [D-HI] |
Rep. Gregory Meeks [D-NY] | Rep. Salud Carbajal [D-CA] | Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA] | Rep. Richard Neal [D-MA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-22 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2019-04-01 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands. |
2019-03-13 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-03-13 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-03-13 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB809 (Related) 2019-03-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
Charitable contributions
Government studies and investigations
Income tax credits
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Taxation
Government studies and investigations
Income tax credits
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Taxation
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/1727/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr1727/BILLS-116hr1727ih.pdf |