US HB1741 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 69-0)
Status: Introduced on March 13 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Violence Against Women Extension Act of 2019 This bill extends through March 31, 2020, 19 grant programs authorized by the Violence Against Women Act of 1994 and subsequent legislation and administered by the Office on Violence Against Women within the Department of Justice.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Violence Against Women Extension Act of 2019

Sponsors

Rep. Elise Stefanik [R-NY]Rep. Will Hurd [R-TX]Rep. Rodney Davis [R-IL]Rep. Steve Stivers [R-OH]
Rep. Tom Emmer [R-MN]Rep. Susan Brooks [R-IN]Rep. Garret Graves [R-LA]Rep. Mario Diaz-Balart [R-FL]
Rep. Jeff Fortenberry [R-NE]Rep. Greg Gianforte [R-MT]Rep. Kevin Brady [R-TX]Rep. Blaine Luetkemeyer [R-MO]
Rep. Jackie Walorski [R-IN]Rep. Greg Walden [R-OR]Rep. Bryan Steil [R-WI]Rep. Christopher Smith [R-NJ]
Rep. Denver Riggleman [R-VA]Rep. Cathy McMorris Rodgers [R-WA]Rep. French Hill [R-AR]Rep. Michael Waltz [R-FL]
Rep. Adrian Smith [R-NE]Rep. John Moolenaar [R-MI]Rep. Larry Bucshon [R-IN]Rep. Bruce Westerman [R-AR]
Rep. Jaime Herrera Beutler [R-WA]Rep. Bill Flores [R-TX]Rep. Pete Olson [R-TX]Rep. Don Bacon [R-NE]
Rep. Vern Buchanan [R-FL]Rep. Steve Womack [R-AR]Rep. Peter King [R-NY]Rep. Michael McCaul [R-TX]
Rep. Troy Balderson [R-OH]Rep. Garland Barr [R-KY]Rep. Robert Latta [R-OH]Rep. Jenniffer Gonzalez-Colon [R-PR]
Rep. Doug LaMalfa [R-CA]Rep. Mike Bost [R-IL]Rep. Pete Stauber [R-MN]Rep. Bill Johnson [R-OH]
Rep. Dusty Johnson [R-SD]Rep. William Timmons [R-SC]Rep. John Curtis [R-UT]Rep. Paul Mitchell [R-MI]
Rep. Guy Reschenthaler [R-PA]Rep. Sean Duffy [R-WI]Rep. Ron Wright [R-TX]Rep. Mike Kelly [R-PA]
Rep. Earl Carter [R-GA]Rep. Robert Wittman [R-VA]Rep. Mike Gallagher [R-WI]Rep. Steve Chabot [R-OH]
Rep. Patrick McHenry [R-NC]Rep. Dan Crenshaw [R-TX]Rep. Glenn Thompson [R-PA]Rep. Ross Spano [R-FL]
Rep. Dan Meuser [R-PA]Rep. Joe Wilson [R-SC]Rep. Lloyd Smucker [R-PA]Rep. John Joyce [R-PA]
Rep. Brad Wenstrup [R-OH]Rep. Tim Burchett [R-TN]Rep. David Joyce [R-OH]Rep. Dan Newhouse [R-WA]
Rep. Ann Wagner [R-MO]Rep. Tim Walberg [R-MI]Rep. Richard Hudson [R-NC]Rep. James Hagedorn [R-MN]
Rep. Steve Watkins [R-KS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
2019-04-03HouseReferred to the Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States.
2019-03-13HouseReferred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Natural Resources, and Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-03-13HouseReferred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Natural Resources, and Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-03-13HouseReferred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Natural Resources, and Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-03-13HouseReferred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Natural Resources, and Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-03-13HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB1239 (Related) 2019-03-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback