US HB1747 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-10-23 - Provisions of measure incorporated in to Title IV of H.R. 3619.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-10-23 - Provisions of measure incorporated in to Title IV of H.R. 3619.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Great Lakes Icebreaker Replacement Act - Authorizes appropriations for the design, acquisition, and construction of a combined buoy tender-icebreaker to replace icebreaking capacity on the Great Lakes.
Title
Great Lakes Icebreaker Replacement Act
Sponsors
Rep. James Oberstar [D-MN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-10-23 | Provisions of measure incorporated in to Title IV of H.R. 3619. | |
2009-04-28 | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. | |
2009-04-27 | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. | |
2009-04-27 | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4749) | |
2009-04-27 | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1747. | |
2009-04-27 | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4749-4750) | |
2009-04-27 | Mr. Oberstar moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. | |
2009-04-21 | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 36. | |
2009-04-21 | Reported by the Committee on Transportation. H. Rept. 111-81. | |
2009-04-02 | Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management Discharged. | |
2009-04-02 | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. | |
2009-04-02 | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. | |
2009-03-27 | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management. | |
2009-03-26 | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. | |
2009-03-26 | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E784) |
Same As/Similar To
HB3619 (Related) 2010-10-15 - Became Public Law No: 111-281.
SB1024 (Related) 2009-05-12 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
SB1024 (Related) 2009-05-12 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Subjects
Coast guard
Department of Defense
Department of Homeland Security
Executive agency funding and structure
Great Lakes
Marine and inland water transportation
Transportation and public works
Transportation programs funding
Department of Defense
Department of Homeland Security
Executive agency funding and structure
Great Lakes
Marine and inland water transportation
Transportation and public works
Transportation programs funding