US HB1747 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 28 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-31 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Brownfields Authorization Increase Act of 2017 This bill amends the Comprehensive Environmental Response, Compensation, and Liability Act of 1980 by: (1) reauthorizing through FY2023 and revising the brownfield revitalization funding program, and (2) permanently reauthorizing a grant program for state and tribal response programs (programs responding to brownfields). (Brownfield sites are certain commercial properties that are hindered from reuse or redevelopment due to the presence of a hazardous substance, pollutant, or contaminant.) Certain nonprofit organizations and community development entities are made eligible for brownfields revitalization funding. The bill increases the cap on the amount that may be given in grants for direct remediation of brownfield sites. The brownfield site characterization and assessment grant program is revised by authorizing eligible entities to receive grants for property they acquired on or before January 11, 2002. The Environmental Protection Agency (EPA) must establish a program to provide multipurpose grants to carry out inventory, characterization, assessment, planning, or remediation activities at brownfield sites. In addition, the EPA must establish a grant program for brownfield projects that reduce the brownfield's environmental impact, increase community livability, and encourage sustainability. The EPA must establish a grant program that provides training, research, and technical assistance to facilitate the inventory of brownfield sites, site assessments, remediation of brownfield sites, community involvement, or site preparation. (Currently, the EPA may provide funding for this purpose.) The bill authorizes the EPA to use up to a specified amount of the funding made available for the grant program on grants to assist small communities, Indian tribes, rural areas, or disadvantaged areas.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Brownfields Authorization Increase Act of 2017

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-31HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Environment.
2017-03-29HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
2017-03-28HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2017-03-28HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2017-03-28HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2017-03-28HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB1758 (Related) 2017-11-21 - Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 115-419, Part I.
HB2479 (Related) 2018-05-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy.
SB822 (Related) 2017-09-07 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 213.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback