US HB1753 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 80-1)
Status: Introduced on March 14 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Worker and Family Support.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Worker and Family Support Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Jobs and Opportunity with Benefits and Services for Success Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Jobs and Opportunity with Benefits and Services for Success Act

Sponsors

Rep. Kevin Brady [R-TX]Rep. Adrian Smith [R-NE]Rep. Jackie Walorski [R-IN]Rep. Devin Nunes [R-CA]
Rep. Vern Buchanan [R-FL]Rep. Kenny Marchant [R-TX]Rep. Tom Reed [R-NY]Rep. Mike Kelly [R-PA]
Rep. Darin LaHood [R-IL]Rep. Brad Wenstrup [R-OH]Rep. Jody Arrington [R-TX]Rep. Drew Ferguson [R-GA]
Rep. Ron Estes [R-KS]Rep. Lloyd Smucker [R-PA]Rep. Dan Meuser [R-PA]Rep. William Timmons [R-SC]
Rep. Jim Banks [R-IN]Rep. Greg Gianforte [R-MT]Rep. Mike Johnson [R-LA]Rep. Paul Mitchell [R-MI]
Rep. Carol Miller [R-WV]Rep. George Holding [R-NC]Rep. Kevin Hern [R-OK]Rep. James Hagedorn [R-MN]
Rep. Guy Reschenthaler [R-PA]Rep. Ralph Norman [R-SC]Rep. Ted Budd [R-NC]Rep. Mark Walker [R-NC]
Rep. Matt Gaetz [R-FL]Rep. Alexander Mooney [R-WV]Rep. Denver Riggleman [R-VA]Rep. Scott DesJarlais [R-TN]
Rep. Greg Steube [R-FL]Rep. Blaine Luetkemeyer [R-MO]Rep. Steve Scalise [R-LA]Rep. John Rutherford [R-FL]
Rep. Mo Brooks [R-AL]Rep. Steve Watkins [R-KS]Rep. Joe Wilson [R-SC]Rep. Barry Loudermilk [R-GA]
Rep. David Schweikert [R-AZ]Rep. Tim Burchett [R-TN]Rep. Ben Cline [R-VA]Rep. Mike D. Rogers [R-AL]
Rep. Ross Spano [R-FL]Rep. Bradley Byrne [R-AL]Rep. Dusty Johnson [R-SD]Rep. David Roe [R-TN]
Rep. Richard Hudson [R-NC]Rep. Eric Crawford [R-AR]Rep. Nicholas Taylor [R-TX]Rep. David Rouzer [R-NC]
Rep. Ann Wagner [R-MO]Rep. Russ Fulcher [R-ID]Rep. Lance Gooden [R-TX]Rep. Michael Cloud [R-TX]
Rep. Scott Perry [R-PA]Rep. Neal Dunn [R-FL]Rep. Roger Williams [R-TX]Rep. Tom Rice [R-SC]
Rep. Bill Huizenga [R-MI]Rep. John Ratcliffe [R-TX]Rep. James Comer [R-KY]Rep. John Curtis [R-UT]
Rep. Mark Green [R-TN]Rep. Ken Buck [R-CO]Rep. Billy Long [R-MO]Rep. John Joyce [R-PA]
Rep. John Rose [R-TN]Rep. Debbie Lesko [D-AZ]Rep. Steven Palazzo [R-MS]Rep. Jason Smith [R-MO]
Rep. Gus Bilirakis [R-FL]Rep. Francis Rooney [R-FL]Rep. Andy Harris [R-MD]Rep. Tom Emmer [R-MN]
Rep. Lee Zeldin [R-NY]Rep. Roger Marshall [R-KS]Rep. Ron Wright [R-TX]Rep. Michael Waltz [R-FL]
Rep. Steve Chabot [R-OH]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-14HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Worker and Family Support.
2019-03-14HouseReferred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
2019-03-14HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB1246 (Related) 2019-02-14 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Worker and Family Support.
HB1413 (Related) 2019-02-27 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Worker and Family Support.
HB1469 (Related) 2019-02-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Worker and Family Support.
HB1490 (Related) 2019-03-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Worker and Family Support.
HB1505 (Related) 2019-03-05 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
SB802 (Same As) 2019-03-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback