US HB1760 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on September 10 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-09-10 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 10 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-09-10 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the Office of Nuclear Energy in the Department of Energy to develop and deploy high-assay low-enriched uranium for domestic commercial use and to develop a schedule for recovering costs associated with such development.
Title
Advanced Nuclear Fuel Availability Act
Sponsors
Rep. Bill Flores [R-TX] | Rep. Jerry McNerney [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-10 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
2019-09-09 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-09-09 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7545) |
2019-09-09 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1760. |
2019-09-09 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7544-7546) |
2019-09-09 | House | Mr. Rush moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2019-03-15 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy. |
2019-03-14 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2019-03-14 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Congressional oversight
Energy
Licensing and registrations
Nuclear power
Nuclear Regulatory Commission (NRC)
Congressional oversight
Energy
Licensing and registrations
Nuclear power
Nuclear Regulatory Commission (NRC)