US HB1768 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4)
Status: Engrossed on September 10 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-18 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Pending: Senate Environment And Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 10 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-18 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Pending: Senate Environment And Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Reauthorizes through FY2024 a diesel emissions reduction program under which the Environmental Protection Agency provides grants, rebates, or loans for replacing diesel engines or retrofitting the engines with pollution control technologies.
Title
Diesel Emissions Reduction Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Doris Matsui [D-CA] | Rep. Billy Long [R-MO] | Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA] | Rep. Robert Wittman [R-VA] |
Rep. Jerrold Nadler [D-NY] | Rep. Matthew Cartwright [D-PA] | Rep. Bobby Rush [D-IL] | Rep. Tom Cole [R-OK] |
Rep. Lucille Roybal-Allard [D-CA] | Rep. Jim Costa [D-CA] | Rep. Ken Calvert [R-CA] | Rep. Jerry McNerney [D-CA] |
Roll Calls
2019-09-09 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill RC# 516 (Y: 295 N: 114 NV: 23 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-18 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works. |
2019-09-10 | Senate | Received in the Senate. |
2019-09-09 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-09-09 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 295 - 114 (Roll no. 516). (text: CR H7541) |
2019-09-09 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H7547-7548) |
2019-09-09 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2019-09-09 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1768. |
2019-09-09 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7541-7543) |
2019-09-09 | House | Mr. Rush moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2019-03-15 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy. |
2019-03-14 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2019-03-14 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB747 (Related) 2019-05-13 - By Senator Barrasso from Committee on Environment and Public Works filed written report. Report No. 116-39.
SB2302 (Related) 2020-01-08 - By Senator Barrasso from Committee on Environment and Public Works filed written report. Report No. 116-200.
SB2302 (Related) 2020-01-08 - By Senator Barrasso from Committee on Environment and Public Works filed written report. Report No. 116-200.
Subjects
Air quality
Environmental protection
Environmental technology
Government lending and loan guarantees
Motor fuels
Motor vehicles
Environmental protection
Environmental technology
Government lending and loan guarantees
Motor fuels
Motor vehicles