US HB1775 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on October 29 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-10-29 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 29 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-10-29 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Federal Aviation Administration (FAA) to establish the FAA Task Force on NOTAM (notice to airmen) Improvement to (1) review existing methods for presenting NOTAMs and flight operations information to pilots; (2) review regulations and policies relating to NOTAMs, including their content and presentation to pilots; (3) evaluate and determine best practices to organize, prioritize, and present flight operations information in a manner that optimizes pilot review and retention of relevant information; and (4) provide recommendations to improve the presentation of NOTAM information. The task force must terminate on the earlier of the date it submits its report or 18 months after its establishment.
Title
Notice to Airmen Improvement Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Pete Stauber [R-MN] | Rep. Mark DeSaulnier [D-CA] | Rep. John Katko [R-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-29 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
2019-10-28 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-10-28 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8487) |
2019-10-28 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1775. |
2019-10-28 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8487-8488) |
2019-10-28 | House | Mr. DeFazio moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2019-05-16 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 43. |
2019-05-16 | House | Reported by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 116-67. |
2019-03-27 | House | Subcommittee on Aviation Discharged. |
2019-03-27 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2019-03-27 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-03-15 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Aviation. |
2019-03-14 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
2019-03-14 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Aviation and airports
Congressional oversight
Department of Transportation
Government studies and investigations
Transportation and public works
Transportation safety and security
Congressional oversight
Department of Transportation
Government studies and investigations
Transportation and public works
Transportation safety and security