US HB1781 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-7)
Status: Introduced on March 14 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Payment Commission Data Act of 2019

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Payment Commission Data Act of 2019

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-03HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
2019-04-03HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-03-27HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
2019-03-27HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-03-15HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
2019-03-14HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
2019-03-14HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-03-14HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-03-14HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB1264 (Same As) 2019-02-14 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SB801 (Related) 2019-03-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback