US HB1803 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on March 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-05 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-05 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Nullifies the supplemental treaty between the United States and the Confederated Tribes and Bands of Indians of Middle Oregon. Among other things, the treaty restricted the rights of tribal members to leave the reservation.
Title
To nullify the Supplemental Treaty Between the United States of America and the Confederated Tribes and Bands of Indians of Middle Oregon, concluded on November 15, 1865.
Sponsors
Rep. Greg Walden [R-OR] | Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR] | Rep. Kurt Schrader [D-OR] | Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR] |
Rep. Suzanne Bonamici [D-OR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-05 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2019-04-03 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States. |
2019-03-14 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2019-03-14 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB832 (Same As) 2020-10-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-175. (TXT | PDF)
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/1803/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr1803/BILLS-116hr1803ih.pdf |