US HB1807 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-11 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-11 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Reauthorizes through FY2021 a grant program to provide innovative transportation options to veterans in highly rural areas.
Title
Highly Rural Veteran Transportation Program Extension Act
Sponsors
Rep. Don Young [R-AK] | Rep. Paul Gosar [R-AZ] | Rep. TJ Cox [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-11 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-03-14 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2019-03-14 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB850 (Related) 2020-08-07 - Held at the desk.
HB8337 (Related) 2020-10-01 - Became Public Law No: 116-159. (TXT | PDF)
HB8337 (Related) 2020-10-01 - Became Public Law No: 116-159. (TXT | PDF)
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Health care coverage and access
Rural conditions and development
Transportation costs
Veterans' medical care
Veterans' organizations and recognition
Health care coverage and access
Rural conditions and development
Transportation costs
Veterans' medical care
Veterans' organizations and recognition
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/1807/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr1807/BILLS-116hr1807ih.pdf |