US HB1809 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-07-10 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 106.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-07-10 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 106.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service to apportion certain wildlife-restoration funds to the U.S. territories and the District of Columbia in the same manner as such funds are apportioned under current law to the states.
Title
To amend the Pittman-Robertson Wildlife Restoration Act and the Dingell-Johnson Sport Fish Restoration Act, to provide parity for United States territories and the District of Columbia, to make technical corrections to such Acts and related laws, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Gregorio Sablan [D-MP] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Amata Radewagen [R-AS] | Rep. Michael San Nicolas [D-GU] |
Rep. Stacey Plaskett [D-VI] | Rep. Jenniffer Gonzalez-Colon [R-PR] | Rep. Jeff Van Drew [R-NJ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-10 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 106. |
2019-07-10 | House | Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 116-144. |
2019-05-01 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2019-05-01 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-05-01 | House | Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife Discharged. |
2019-03-26 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2019-03-20 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife. |
2019-03-18 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2019-03-18 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
American Samoa
District of Columbia
Firearms and explosives
Fishes
Guam
Northern Mariana Islands
Public lands and natural resources
Puerto Rico
Sales and excise taxes
State and local finance
U.S. territories and protectorates
Virgin Islands
District of Columbia
Firearms and explosives
Fishes
Guam
Northern Mariana Islands
Public lands and natural resources
Puerto Rico
Sales and excise taxes
State and local finance
U.S. territories and protectorates
Virgin Islands