US HB1815 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on October 21 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-10-21 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 21 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-10-21 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Securities and Exchange Commission (SEC) to assess the usefulness of certain disclosure rules to retail investors. Specifically, the SEC must make these assessments regarding both current and new securities rules and regulations that require the disclosure of documents or information to retail investors.
Title
SEC Disclosure Effectiveness Testing Act
Sponsors
Rep. Sean Casten [D-IL] |
Roll Calls
2019-10-17 - House - On passage RC# 564 (Y: 229 N: 186 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-17 - House - On agreeing to the Wagner amendment (A003) H.Amdt.629 RC# 563 (Y: 188 N: 230 NV: 19 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-10-17 - House - On agreeing to the Gottheimer amendment (A002) H.Amdt.628 RC# 562 (Y: 240 N: 178 NV: 19 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-17 - House - On agreeing to the Huizenga amendment (A001) H.Amdt.627 RC# 561 (Y: 188 N: 229 NV: 20 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-10-17 - House - On agreeing to the Wagner amendment (A003) H.Amdt.629 RC# 563 (Y: 188 N: 230 NV: 19 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-10-17 - House - On agreeing to the Gottheimer amendment (A002) H.Amdt.628 RC# 562 (Y: 240 N: 178 NV: 19 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-17 - House - On agreeing to the Huizenga amendment (A001) H.Amdt.627 RC# 561 (Y: 188 N: 229 NV: 20 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-21 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. |
2019-10-17 | House | The Clerk was authorized to correct section numbers, punctuation, and cross references, and to make other necessary technical and conforming corrections in the engrossment of H.R. 1815. |
2019-10-17 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-10-17 | House | On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 229 - 186 (Roll no. 564). |
2019-10-17 | House | The House adopted the amendment in the nature of a substitute as agreed to by the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union. |
2019-10-17 | House | The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule. |
2019-10-17 | House | The House rose from the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union to report H.R. 1815. |
2019-10-17 | House | H.Amdt.629 On agreeing to the Wagner amendment (A003) Failed by recorded vote: 188 - 230 (Roll no. 563). |
2019-10-17 | House | H.Amdt.628 On agreeing to the Gottheimer amendment (A002) Agreed to by recorded vote: 240 - 178 (Roll no. 562). |
2019-10-17 | House | H.Amdt.627 On agreeing to the Huizenga amendment (A001) Failed by recorded vote: 188 - 229 (Roll no. 561). |
2019-10-17 | House | H.Amdt.630 On agreeing to the Casten (IL) amendment (A004) Agreed to by voice vote. |
2019-10-17 | House | DEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H.Res. 629, the Committee of the Whole proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Casten (IL) amendment No. 4. |
2019-10-17 | House | H.Amdt.630 Amendment (A004) offered by Mr. Casten (IL). (consideration: CR H8219-8220; text: CR H8219) |
2019-10-17 | House | POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on the Wagner amendment, the Chair put the question on the amendment and by voice vote, announced that the noes had prevailed. Mrs. Wagner demanded a recorded vote and the Chair postponed further proceedings on agreeing to the amendment until a time to be announced. |
2019-10-17 | House | DEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H.Res. 629, the Committee of the Whole proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Wagner amendment No. 3. |
2019-10-17 | House | H.Amdt.629 Amendment (A003) offered by Mrs. Wagner. (consideration: CR H8218-8219, H8221-8222; text: CR H8218) |
2019-10-17 | House | POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on the Gottheimer amendment, the Chair put the question on the amendment and by voice vote, announced that the ayes had prevailed. Mr. Gottheimer demanded a recorded vote and the Chair postponed further proceedings on agreeing to the amendment until a time to be announced. |
2019-10-17 | House | DEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H.Res. 629, the Committee of the Whole proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Gottheimer amendment No. 2. |
2019-10-17 | House | H.Amdt.628 Amendment (A002) offered by Mr. Gottheimer. (consideration: CR H8217-8218, H8220-8221; text: CR H8217) |
2019-10-17 | House | POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on the Huizenga amendment, the Chair put the question on the amendment and by voice vote, announced that the noes had prevailed. Mr. Huizenga demanded a recorded vote and the Chair postponed further proceedings on agreeing to the amendment until a time to be announced. |
2019-10-17 | House | DEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H.Res. 629, the Committee of the Whole proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Huizenga amendment No. 1. |
2019-10-17 | House | H.Amdt.627 Amendment (A001) offered by Mr. Huizenga. (consideration: CR H8216-8217, H8220; text: CR H8216) |
2019-10-17 | House | GENERAL DEBATE - The Committee of the Whole proceeded with one hour of general debate on H.R. 1815. |
2019-10-17 | House | House resolved itself into the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union pursuant to H. Res. 629 and Rule XVIII. |
2019-10-17 | House | The Speaker designated the Honorable James R. Langevin to act as Chairman of the Committee. |
2019-10-17 | House | Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 1815 and H.R. 3624 with 1 hour of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit with or without instructions. Measure will be considered read. Specified amendments are in order. |
2019-10-17 | House | Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 629. (consideration: CR H8209-8224; text: CR H8215-8216) |
2019-10-15 | House | Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 629 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 1815 and H.R. 3624 with 1 hour of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit with or without instructions. Measure will be considered read. Specified amendments are in order. |
2019-06-20 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 91. |
2019-06-20 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 116-123. |
2019-03-28 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 33 - 26. |
2019-03-28 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-03-27 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-03-26 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-03-18 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services. |
2019-03-18 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HR629 (Related) 2019-10-16 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Congressional oversight
Finance and financial sector
Financial services and investments
Government studies and investigations
Securities
Securities and Exchange Commission (SEC)
Congressional oversight
Finance and financial sector
Financial services and investments
Government studies and investigations
Securities
Securities and Exchange Commission (SEC)