US HB1819 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on December 7 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-07 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 7 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-07 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Expands the Department of State's rewards program to authorize rewards for providing information leading to the arrest, conviction, or transfer of a foreign national accused of war crimes, crimes against humanity, or genocide as such crimes as defined under the law of an international criminal tribunal, the applicable country, or the United States. Currently, rewards are authorized for information leading to the arrest, conviction, or transfer of a foreign national accused of such crimes only as defined under the statutes of the relevant tribunal.
Title
War Crimes Rewards Expansion Act
Sponsors
Rep. Virginia Foxx [R-NC] | Rep. Eliot Engel [D-NY] | Rep. James McGovern [D-MA] | Rep. Joe Wilson [R-SC] |
Rep. Christopher Smith [R-NJ] | Rep. Albio Sires [D-NJ] | Rep. Cathy McMorris Rodgers [R-WA] | Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI] |
Rep. Tom Malinowski [D-NJ] | Rep. Brad Sherman [D-CA] | Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD] | Rep. Jack Bergman [R-MI] |
Rep. Ann Wagner [R-MO] | Rep. Jeff Fortenberry [R-NE] | Rep. Nicholas Taylor [R-TX] | Rep. Abigail Spanberger [D-VA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-07 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. |
2020-12-03 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-12-03 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6082) |
2020-12-03 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1819. |
2020-12-03 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6082-6083) |
2020-12-03 | House | Mr. Engel moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2019-10-30 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2019-10-30 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-03-18 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
2019-03-18 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Evidence and witnesses
International affairs
War crimes, genocide, crimes against humanity
Evidence and witnesses
International affairs
War crimes, genocide, crimes against humanity