US HB1825 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-18 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-18 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Internal Revenue Service (IRS) to respond to Taxpayer Advocate Directives within specified time frames. In the case of a Taxpayer Advocate Directive issued by the National Taxpayer Advocate (NTA) pursuant to a delegation of authority from the IRS, the IRS Commissioner or a Deputy Commissioner must modify, rescind, or ensure compliance with the directive within 90 days. If a directive is modified or rescinded by a Deputy Commissioner, the NTA may appeal to the Commissioner. Within 90 days of the appeal, the Commissioner must either ensure compliance with the directive or provide a description of the reasons for any modification or rescission made or upheld pursuant to the appeal. The bill also requires the NTA annual report to identify any directive that was not honored by the IRS in a timely manner, as required by this bill.
Title
Improving Assistance for Taxpayers Act
Sponsors
Rep. Darin LaHood [R-IL] | Rep. Thomas Suozzi [D-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-18 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
2019-03-18 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB1957 (Related) 2020-08-04 - Became Public Law No: 116-152. (TXT | PDF)
SB928 (Related) 2019-03-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S2091)
HB3151 (Related) 2019-07-01 - Became Public Law No: 116-25. (TXT | PDF)
HR1053 (Similar To) 2020-07-20 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB928 (Related) 2019-03-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S2091)
HB3151 (Related) 2019-07-01 - Became Public Law No: 116-25. (TXT | PDF)
HR1053 (Similar To) 2020-07-20 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/1825/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr1825/BILLS-116hr1825ih.pdf |