US HB1846 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 51-0)
Status: Introduced on March 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 21 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes various programs to increase access to diapers for low-income families with infants and toddlers. Specifically, the bill provides grants to agencies or organizations with experience in community distribution services for the purchase, warehousing, and distribution of diapers and diapering supplies (e.g., diaper wipes and creams) to families with (1) at least one child under the age of 4, and (2) an income of no more than 200% of the federal poverty level. The bill also permits states to use Medicaid funds to provide diapers and diapering supplies to low-income families with a child 3 or older who has been diagnosed with one or more specified forms of conditions that create a need for the use of diapers. Additionally, the bill includes diapers and diapering supplies as qualifying medical expenses under (1) health and medical savings accounts, and (2) flexible health spending and reimbursement arrangements.
Title
End Diaper Need Act of 2019
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-22 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-03-21 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-03-21 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-03-21 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-03-21 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB1922 (Related) 2020-12-18 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 559.
SB1404 (Related) 2019-05-09 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB1404 (Related) 2019-05-09 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
Child health
Community life and organization
Congressional oversight
Family services
Government information and archives
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Health programs administration and funding
Health technology, devices, supplies
Income tax deductions
Poverty and welfare assistance
Community life and organization
Congressional oversight
Family services
Government information and archives
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Health programs administration and funding
Health technology, devices, supplies
Income tax deductions
Poverty and welfare assistance
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/1846/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr1846/BILLS-116hr1846ih.pdf |