US HB1850 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 35-10)
Status: Engrossed on July 24 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-24 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 24 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-24 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Imposes sanctions targeting Hamas, the Palestinian Islamic Jihad, and any affiliate or successor groups. The President shall periodically report to Congress a list of each foreign person or instrumentality that knowingly assists, provides significant support or services to, or is involved in a significant transaction with a senior member or supporter of any of the targeted groups. The President shall impose two or more sanctions on the named persons. Specifically, such a person may be (1) denied credit and services from the Export-Import Bank, (2) barred from purchasing certain controlled defense articles, (3) denied exports of items on the U.S. Munitions List, (4) prevented from receiving exports of certain goods or technology controlled for national security reasons, (5) prohibited from receiving financing of more than $10 million from any U.S. financial institution, or (6) subject to property-blocking restrictions. The President shall periodically report to Congress a list of foreign governments that have repeatedly provided material support for the targeted groups' terrorist activities. The President shall bar such governments from receiving for one year (1) U.S. assistance, or (2) exports of controlled munitions. The Department of Treasury shall instruct U.S. leadership of international financial institutions to oppose the provision of assistance to an identified government for one year. The bill provides for certain exceptions and waivers, such as for transactions that would serve U.S. national interests. The President shall report to Congress and periodically provide briefings on other specified topics related to the targeted groups, such as where such groups secure financing and surveillance equipment.
Title
Palestinian International Terrorism Support Prevention Act of 2019
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-24 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. |
2019-07-23 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-07-23 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7198-7201) |
2019-07-23 | House | DEBATE - The House resumed with debate on H.R. 1850. |
2019-07-23 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1850. |
2019-07-23 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7198-7202) |
2019-07-23 | House | Mr. Engel moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2019-07-17 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent. |
2019-07-17 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-03-21 | House | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-03-21 | House | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-03-21 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2680 (Related) 2019-10-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Subjects
Competitiveness, trade promotion, trade deficits
Congressional oversight
Foreign aid and international relief
Foreign and international banking
Foreign loans and debt
Foreign property
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
International affairs
Licensing and registrations
Middle East
Military assistance, sales, and agreements
Multilateral development programs
Palestinians
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents
Sanctions
Terrorism
Trade restrictions
War and emergency powers
Congressional oversight
Foreign aid and international relief
Foreign and international banking
Foreign loans and debt
Foreign property
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
International affairs
Licensing and registrations
Middle East
Military assistance, sales, and agreements
Multilateral development programs
Palestinians
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents
Sanctions
Terrorism
Trade restrictions
War and emergency powers