US HB1875 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-26 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-26 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the Department of the Treasury to establish a Community Volunteer Income Tax Assistance Matching Grant Program to provide matching funds for the development, expansion, or continuation of tax return preparation programs for low-income and underserved populations.
Title
VITA Permanence Act of 2019 Volunteer Income Tax Assistance Permanence Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Danny Davis [D-IL] | Rep. Brad Wenstrup [R-OH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-26 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
2019-03-26 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB1436 (Related) 2019-02-28 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB1957 (Related) 2020-08-04 - Became Public Law No: 116-152. (TXT | PDF)
SB928 (Related) 2019-03-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S2091)
HB3151 (Related) 2019-07-01 - Became Public Law No: 116-25. (TXT | PDF)
HR1053 (Similar To) 2020-07-20 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB1957 (Related) 2020-08-04 - Became Public Law No: 116-152. (TXT | PDF)
SB928 (Related) 2019-03-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S2091)
HB3151 (Related) 2019-07-01 - Became Public Law No: 116-25. (TXT | PDF)
HR1053 (Similar To) 2020-07-20 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Government information and archives
Poverty and welfare assistance
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
Taxation
Poverty and welfare assistance
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
Taxation
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/1875/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr1875/BILLS-116hr1875ih.pdf |