US HB1876 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-01 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-01 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the Senior Investor Taskforce within the Securities and Exchange Commission. The taskforce must report on topics relating to investors over the age of 65, including industry trends and serious issues impacting such investors, and make recommendations for legislative or regulatory actions to address problems encountered by senior investors. The Government Accountability Office must report on the financial exploitation of senior citizens.
Title
National Senior Investor Initiative Act of 2019 Senior Security Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Josh Gottheimer [D-NJ] | Rep. Trey Hollingsworth [R-IN] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. Nicholas Taylor [R-TX] |
Rep. Abby Finkenauer [D-IA] | Rep. Vicente Gonzalez [D-TX] | Rep. Sean Casten [D-IL] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-30 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill RC# 170 (Y: 392 N: 20 NV: 19 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-01 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. |
2019-04-30 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-04-30 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 392 - 20 (Roll no. 170). (text: CR H3314-3315) |
2019-04-30 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H3321-3322) |
2019-04-30 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2019-04-30 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1876. |
2019-04-30 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3314-3316) |
2019-04-30 | House | Mr. Foster moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2019-03-26 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services. |
2019-03-26 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1719 (Related) 2019-06-05 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Subjects
Aging
Banking and financial institutions regulation
Congressional oversight
Finance and financial sector
Financial literacy
Financial services and investments
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government studies and investigations
Banking and financial institutions regulation
Congressional oversight
Finance and financial sector
Financial literacy
Financial services and investments
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government studies and investigations