US HB1884 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 159-1)
Status: Introduced on March 26 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Protecting Pre-Existing Conditions and Making Health Care More Affordable Act of 2019

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Protecting Pre-Existing Conditions and Making Health Care More Affordable Act of 2019

Sponsors

Rep. Frank Pallone [D-NJ]Rep. Richard Neal [D-MA]Rep. Robert Scott [D-VA]Rep. Steny Hoyer [D-MD]
Rep. Kim Schrier [D-WA]Rep. Gil Cisneros [D-CA]Rep. Diana DeGette [D-CO]Rep. Kathy Castor [D-FL]
Rep. Lori Trahan [D-MA]Rep. Angela Craig [D-MN]Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH]Rep. Raul Ruiz [D-CA]
Rep. Brendan Boyle [D-PA]Rep. Colin Allred [D-TX]Rep. Cheri Bustos [D-IL]Rep. Lucy McBath [D-GA]
Rep. Ben Lujan [D-NM]Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA]Rep. Scott Peters [D-CA]Rep. Frederica Wilson [D-FL]
Rep. Abigail Spanberger [D-VA]Rep. Harley Rouda [D-CA]Rep. Lauren Underwood [D-IL]Rep. Antonio Delgado [D-NY]
Rep. Suzanne Lee [D-NV]Rep. Lisa Rochester [D-DE]Rep. Lloyd Doggett [D-TX]Rep. Jimmy Gomez [D-CA]
Rep. Debbie Dingell [D-MI]Rep. Donna Shalala [D-FL]Rep. Lois Frankel [D-FL]Rep. Anna Eshoo [D-CA]
Rep. Albio Sires [D-NJ]Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL]Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX]Rep. William Keating [D-MA]
Rep. Haley Stevens [D-MI]Rep. Terri Sewell [D-AL]Rep. David Trone [D-MD]Rep. Max Rose [D-NY]
Rep. Ann Kirkpatrick [D-AZ]Rep. John Larson [D-CT]Rep. John Lewis [D-GA]Rep. Pramila Jayapal [D-WA]
Rep. Sylvia Garcia [D-TX]Rep. Joe Courtney [D-CT]Rep. Linda Sanchez [D-CA]Rep. Val Demings [D-FL]
Rep. Stephanie Murphy [D-FL]Rep. Madeleine Dean [D-PA]Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN]Rep. Mike Thompson [D-CA]
Rep. Bobby Rush [D-IL]Rep. Joseph Morelle [D-NY]Rep. Katie Hill [D-CA]Rep. Brian Higgins [D-NY]
Rep. Susan Davis [D-CA]Rep. Julia Brownley [D-CA]Rep. Bill Pascrell [D-NJ]Rep. Elissa Slotkin [D-MI]
Rep. Eliot Engel [D-NY]Rep. Andy Kim [D-NJ]Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR]Rep. Jahana Hayes [D-CT]
Rep. TJ Cox [D-CA]Rep. Mark Takano [D-CA]Rep. Jimmy Panetta [D-CA]Rep. Daniel Kildee [D-MI]
Rep. Tom Malinowski [D-NJ]Rep. Andy Levin [D-MI]Rep. Jared Golden [D-ME]Rep. Jeff Van Drew [D-NJ]
Rep. Debbie Mucarsel-Powell [D-FL]Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ]Rep. Adriano Espaillat [D-NY]Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL]
Rep. Chellie Pingree [D-ME]Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC]Rep. Gregorio Sablan [I-MP]Rep. Thomas Suozzi [D-NY]
Rep. Ron Kind [D-WI]Rep. Eddie Johnson [D-TX]Rep. Michael Doyle [D-PA]Rep. Doris Matsui [D-CA]
Rep. Jason Crow [D-CO]Rep. Katherine Clark [D-MA]Rep. Denny Heck [D-WA]Rep. Christopher Pappas [D-NH]
Rep. Suzanne Bonamici [D-OR]Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL]Rep. John Sarbanes [D-MD]Rep. Jackie Speier [D-CA]
Rep. Paul Tonko [D-NY]Rep. C.A. Ruppersberger [D-MD]Rep. Theodore Deutch [D-FL]Rep. Rosa DeLauro [D-CT]
Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD]Rep. Nanette Barragan [D-CA]Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA]Rep. Ami Bera [D-CA]
Rep. Mark DeSaulnier [D-CA]Rep. Chrissy Houlahan [D-PA]Rep. Sharice Davids [D-KS]Rep. Hakeem Jeffries [D-NY]
Rep. Jennifer Wexton [D-VA]Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA]Rep. Salud Carbajal [D-CA]Rep. Donald Norcross [D-NJ]
Rep. Adam Smith [D-WA]Rep. Steven Horsford [D-NV]Rep. Ilhan Omar [D-MN]Rep. Judy Chu [D-CA]
Rep. John Yarmuth [D-KY]Rep. Tony Cardenas [D-CA]Rep. Sean Casten [D-IL]Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR]
Rep. Dean Phillips [D-MN]Rep. John Garamendi [D-CA]Rep. Mike Quigley [D-IL]Rep. Elijah Cummings [D-MD]
Rep. Alma Adams [D-NC]Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA]Rep. Mike Levin [D-CA]Rep. Maxine Waters [D-CA]
Rep. Joseph Kennedy [D-MA]Rep. Rick Larsen [D-WA]Rep. Mark Pocan [D-WI]Rep. Donald McEachin [D-VA]
Rep. Joseph Neguse [D-CO]Rep. Veronica Escobar [D-TX]Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA]Rep. Donald Payne [D-NJ]
Rep. Mary Gay Scanlon [D-PA]Rep. Danny Davis [D-IL]Rep. Matthew Cartwright [D-PA]Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA]
Rep. Kurt Schrader [D-OR]Rep. Carolyn Maloney [D-NY]Rep. Bradley Schneider [D-IL]Rep. Kathleen Rice [D-NY]
Rep. Debbie Wasserman Schultz [D-FL]Rep. Abby Finkenauer [D-IA]Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA]Rep. Bonnie Coleman [D-NJ]
Rep. Ayanna Pressley [D-MA]Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI]Rep. Suzan DelBene [D-WA]Rep. Ruben Gallego [D-AZ]
Rep. Seth Moulton [D-MA]Rep. James Langevin [D-RI]Rep. Henry Johnson [D-GA]Rep. Elaine Luria [D-VA]
Rep. James Himes [D-CT]Rep. Katie Porter [D-CA]Rep. Ed Case [D-HI]Rep. David Price [D-NC]
Rep. Anthony Brown [D-MD]Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA]Rep. Henry Cuellar [D-TX]Rep. Betty McCollum [D-MN]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-26HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
2019-03-26HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, and Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-03-26HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, and Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-03-26HouseReferred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, and Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-03-26HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB986 (Related) 2019-05-15 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 90.
HB987 (Related) 2019-05-20 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HB1010 (Related) 2019-05-10 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 29.
HB1385 (Related) 2019-05-03 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 27.
HB1386 (Related) 2019-05-03 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 28.
HB1425 (Related) 2019-04-04 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 30 - 22.
HB1868 (Related) 2019-03-26 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB1870 (Related) 2019-03-26 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
SB455 (Related) 2019-02-12 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB466 (Related) 2019-02-13 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HR357 (Similar To) 2019-05-09 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR377 (Similar To) 2019-05-15 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB1556 (Related) 2019-05-21 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback