US HB1885 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits a sanctuary jurisdiction from receiving federal financial assistance. The term "sanctuary jurisdiction" means a state or local government that prohibits or restricts (1) information sharing about an individual's immigration status, or (2) compliance with a lawfully issued detainer request or notification of release request. The bill authorizes a state or local government to comply with a detainer and limits the liability of a state or local government for complying with the detainer.
Title
No Federal Funding to Benefit Sanctuary Cities Act
Sponsors
Rep. Francis Rooney [R-FL] | Rep. Ron Wright [R-TX] | Rep. Greg Steube [R-FL] | Rep. Steve Watkins [R-KS] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship. |
2019-03-26 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Oversight and Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-03-26 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Oversight and Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-03-26 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB3000 (Related) 2019-06-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
SB1644 (Related) 2019-05-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB1644 (Related) 2019-05-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Subjects
Border security and unlawful immigration
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Department of Homeland Security
Detention of persons
Government liability
Immigration
Immigration status and procedures
Intergovernmental relations
Law enforcement administration and funding
Law enforcement officers
State and local finance
State and local government operations
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Department of Homeland Security
Detention of persons
Government liability
Immigration
Immigration status and procedures
Intergovernmental relations
Law enforcement administration and funding
Law enforcement officers
State and local finance
State and local government operations
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/1885/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr1885/BILLS-116hr1885ih.pdf |