US HB1892 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-16 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-16 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Makes numerous changes to the quadrennial homeland security reviews. The quadrennial homeland security review is the Department of Homeland Security's capstone strategy document, which offers recommendations on long-term strategy and priorities for homeland security. Specifically, the changes are related to consultation, prioritization, resources required, deadlines, and documentation.
Title
Quadrennial Homeland Security Review Technical Corrections Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Bonnie Coleman [D-NJ] | Rep. Nicholas Taylor [R-TX] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-15 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill RC# 209 (Y: 415 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-16 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
2019-05-15 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-05-15 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 415 - 0 (Roll no. 209). (text: CR 5/14/2019 H3761) |
2019-05-15 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H3825-3826) |
2019-05-14 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2019-05-14 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1892. |
2019-05-14 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3761-3762) |
2019-05-14 | House | Ms. Torres Small (NM) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2019-04-08 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Oversight, Management, and Accountability. |
2019-03-26 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Homeland Security. |
2019-03-26 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB8791 (Related) 2020-11-20 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management.
Subjects
Advisory bodies
Congressional oversight
Department of Homeland Security
Emergency management
Executive agency funding and structure
Government studies and investigations
Homeland security
Public contracts and procurement
Congressional oversight
Department of Homeland Security
Emergency management
Executive agency funding and structure
Government studies and investigations
Homeland security
Public contracts and procurement