US HB1895 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
Pending: House Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
Pending: House Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To restore the integrity of the Fifth Amendment to the Constitution of the United States, and for other purposes.
Title
FAIR Act Fifth Amendment Integrity Restoration Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Tim Walberg [R-MI] | Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD] | Rep. Thomas Massie [R-KY] | Rep. Tony Cardenas [D-CA] |
Rep. Tom McClintock [R-CA] | Rep. Bobby Rush [D-IL] | Rep. Paul Gosar [R-AZ] | Rep. Alexander Mooney [R-WV] |
Rep. Tim Ryan [D-OH] | Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] | Rep. Warren Davidson [R-OH] | Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL] |
Rep. Brendan Boyle [D-PA] | Rep. David Roe [R-TN] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL] |
Rep. Jackie Speier [D-CA] | Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI] | Rep. Dan Meuser [R-PA] | Rep. Josh Harder [D-CA] |
Rep. Kelly Armstrong [R-ND] | Sen. Markwayne Mullin [R-OK] | Rep. Bill Posey [R-FL] | Rep. Adrian Smith [R-NE] |
Rep. Frank Lucas [R-OK] | Rep. Tulsi Gabbard [D-HI] | Rep. Joyce Beatty [D-OH] | Rep. Guy Reschenthaler [R-PA] |
Rep. Scott Perry [R-PA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties. |
2019-03-28 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-03-27 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Ways and Means, and Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-03-27 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Ways and Means, and Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-03-27 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Ways and Means, and Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-03-27 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, Ways and Means, and Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-03-27 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB4074 (Related) 2020-06-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Subjects
Civil actions and liability
Congressional oversight
Crime and law enforcement
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Currency
Customs enforcement
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Evidence and witnesses
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government trust funds
Congressional oversight
Crime and law enforcement
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Currency
Customs enforcement
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Evidence and witnesses
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government trust funds
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/1895/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr1895/BILLS-116hr1895ih.pdf |