US HB19 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 194-63-1)
Status: Introduced on March 30 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-07 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Federal Lands Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 30 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-07 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Federal Lands Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Smithsonian Women's History Museum Act This bill establishes a comprehensive women's history museum within the Smithsonian Institution in Washington, DC, to provide for: (1) the collection, study, and establishment of programs related to women's contributions that have influenced the direction of the United States; (2) collaboration with other Smithsonian museums and facilities, outside museums, and educational institutions; and (3) the creation of exhibitions and programs that recognize diverse perspectives on women's history and contributions. The bill establishes a council within the Smithsonian Institution to: (1) make recommendations to the Smithsonian's Board of Regents for the construction of the museum; (2) advise and assist the board on the administration and preservation of the museum; (3) recommend annual operating budgets for the museum; and (4) report annually to the board on the acquisition, disposition, and display of objects related to women's art, history, and culture. The council shall have sole authority to: (1) acquire artifacts for the museum's collections, (2) dispose of any part of the collections but only if funds generated are used for additions to the collections, (3) specify criteria for the use of the museum's collections and resources, and (4) preserve and maintain the collections. The museum's director may carry out educational and liaison programs in support of its goals.
Title
Smithsonian Women's History Museum Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-07 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands. |
2017-03-31 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management. |
2017-03-30 | House | Referred to the Committee on House Administration, and in addition to the Committees on Natural Resources, and Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-03-30 | House | Referred to the Committee on House Administration, and in addition to the Committees on Natural Resources, and Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-03-30 | House | Referred to the Committee on House Administration, and in addition to the Committees on Natural Resources, and Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-03-30 | House | Referred to the Committee on House Administration, and in addition to the Committees on Natural Resources, and Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-03-30 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E417) |
2017-03-30 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1498 (Related) 2017-06-29 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S3862)
Subjects
Arts, culture, religion
District of Columbia
Executive agency funding and structure
Museums, exhibitions, cultural centers
Smithsonian Institution
U.S. history
Women's employment
Women's rights
District of Columbia
Executive agency funding and structure
Museums, exhibitions, cultural centers
Smithsonian Institution
U.S. history
Women's employment
Women's rights
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/19/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr19/BILLS-115hr19ih.pdf |