US HB190 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 17 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-17 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship.
Pending: Senate Small Business And Entrepreneurship Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 17 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-17 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship.
Pending: Senate Small Business And Entrepreneurship Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Eliminates the inclusion of option years in the award price for certain sole source contracts (i.e., contracts awarded without a competitive process). Under current law, option years in the award price for such contracts limit their dollar award threshold. Specifically, the bill revises requirements for the award of these contracts to (1) qualified Historically Underutilized Business Zone (HUBZone) small businesses, (2) small businesses owned and controlled by service-disabled veterans, (3) economically disadvantaged small businesses owned and controlled by women, and (4) small businesses owned and controlled by women in substantially underrepresented industries. The Government Accountability Office must evaluate the policies and practices used by the Small Business Administration and other federal agencies to ensure that contracting officers are properly classifying sole source contracts under procurement programs for businesses owned by women and disabled veterans in the Federal Procurement Data System.
Title
Expanding Contracting Opportunities for Small Businesses Act of 2019
Sponsors
Sen. Roger Marshall [R-KS] | Rep. Bradley Schneider [D-IL] | Rep. Josh Harder [D-CA] |
Roll Calls
2019-01-16 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill RC# 36 (Y: 415 N: 6 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-17 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. |
2019-01-16 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-01-16 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 415 - 6 (Roll no. 36). (text: CR 1/14/2019 H528-529) |
2019-01-16 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H626) |
2019-01-14 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2019-01-14 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 190. |
2019-01-14 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H528-531) |
2019-01-14 | House | Ms. Velazquez moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2019-01-03 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Small Business. |
2019-01-03 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB673 (Related) 2019-06-12 - Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Hearings held.
Subjects
Commerce
Economic development
Government studies and investigations
Public contracts and procurement
Small business
Urban and suburban affairs and development
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Women in business
Economic development
Government studies and investigations
Public contracts and procurement
Small business
Urban and suburban affairs and development
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Women in business