US HB1904 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on March 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-09 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 352.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-09 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 352.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Makes permanent, and provides funding for, the Reclamation Water Settlements Fund. Currently, the fund terminates at the end of FY2034.
Title
Indian Water Rights Settlement Extension Act
Sponsors
Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] | Rep. Ruben Gallego [D-AZ] | Rep. Debra Haaland [D-NM] | Rep. Tulsi Gabbard [D-HI] |
Rep. Tom O'Halleran [D-AZ] | Rep. Angela Craig [D-MN] | Rep. Nydia Velazquez [D-NY] | Rep. Steven Horsford [D-NV] |
Sen. Ben Lujan [D-NM] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-09 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 352. |
2020-07-09 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 116-440. |
2020-02-12 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 22 - 14. |
2020-02-12 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-04-04 | House | Committee Hearings Held. |
2019-03-27 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2019-03-27 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
Subjects
Department of the Treasury
Executive agency funding and structure
Indian lands and resources rights
Water resources development
Water resources funding
Executive agency funding and structure
Indian lands and resources rights
Water resources development
Water resources funding