US HB1916 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Introduced on April 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Strategic Forces.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Strategic Forces Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Strategic Forces.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Strategic Forces Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Patriot Inventory Protection Act This bill requires the Army to evaluate its ability to meet war fighter requirements and operational needs, if GEM-T interceptors are removed from its operational inventory, by either: (1) recertifying GEM-T interceptors; or (2) developing, testing, and fielding a new low-cost interceptor that can be placed on the Army's operational inventory prior to the retirement of GEM-T interceptors. GEM-T interceptors are surface-to-air Patriot Guided Enhanced Missiles. The bill prohibits funds made available for the Army for FY2018 or thereafter from being obligated or expended to demilitarize any GEM-T interceptor or to remove any such interceptor from its operational inventory until the Army submits such evaluation to the congressional defense committees. Such limitation shall not apply to activities that the Army determines are critical to the safety of GEM-T interceptors.
Title
Patriot Inventory Protection Act
Sponsors
Rep. Bill Shuster [R-PA] | Rep. Mike D. Rogers [R-AL] | Rep. Austin Scott [R-GA] | Rep. Trent Franks [R-AZ] |
Rep. Duncan Hunter [R-CA] | Rep. Michael Turner [R-OH] | Rep. Seth Moulton [D-MA] | Rep. Niki Tsongas [D-MA] |
Rep. Jim Bridenstine [R-OK] |
Roll Calls
Senate - On the Cloture Motion S.Amdt. 1003 to H.R. 2810 (National Defense Authorization Act for Fiscal Year 2018) (Y: 84 N: 9 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - On Cloture on the Motion to Proceed H.R. 2810 (Y: 89 N: 3 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - On Cloture on the Motion to Proceed H.R. 2810 (Y: 89 N: 3 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-24 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Strategic Forces. |
2017-04-05 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services. |
2017-04-05 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB2810 (Related) 2017-12-12 - Became Public Law No: 115-91. (TXT | PDF)
HR616 (Similar To) 2017-11-14 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR616 (Similar To) 2017-11-14 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Congressional oversight
Defense spending
Government studies and investigations
Military operations and strategy
Military procurement, research, weapons development
Congressional oversight
Defense spending
Government studies and investigations
Military operations and strategy
Military procurement, research, weapons development