US HB1923 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 153-16)
Status: Passed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Became Public Law No: 116-330.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requires the Department of the Treasury to mint and issue quarter-dollar coins in commemoration of the ratification of the Nineteenth Amendment granting women the right to vote. The design on the reverse of each coin shall be emblematic of the accomplishments and contributions of a prominent woman who was a resident of a state, the District of Columbia, or a U.S. territory. Such coins shall be issued in alphabetical order of the area represented, starting with the state of Alabama. Treasury shall initiate a program to promote collection of the coins and recognition of their subjects, and strike and make available for sale silver bullion coins that are the exact duplicates of the coins.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Circulating Collectible Coin Redesign Act of 2020

Sponsors

Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA]Rep. Anthony Gonzalez [R-OH]Rep. Marcy Kaptur [D-OH]Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA]
Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC]Rep. Lori Trahan [D-MA]Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ]Rep. Grace Meng [D-NY]
Rep. Bill Pascrell [D-NJ]Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD]Rep. Sanford Bishop [D-GA]Rep. Henry Johnson [D-GA]
Rep. Susan Davis [D-CA]Rep. Marcia Fudge [D-OH]Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI]Rep. Bonnie Coleman [D-NJ]
Rep. Lisa Rochester [D-DE]Rep. Joseph Neguse [D-CO]Rep. G. Butterfield [D-NC]Rep. Steven Horsford [D-NV]
Rep. Emanuel Cleaver [D-MO]Rep. Karen Bass [D-CA]Rep. Brenda Lawrence [D-MI]Rep. Joyce Beatty [D-OH]
Rep. Stacey Plaskett [D-VI]Rep. James Clyburn [D-SC]Rep. Cedric Richmond [D-LA]Rep. Bennie Thompson [D-MS]
Rep. Donald Payne [D-NJ]Rep. Al Lawson [D-FL]Rep. Danny Davis [D-IL]Rep. Robin Kelly [D-IL]
Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX]Rep. Bradley Schneider [D-IL]Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA]Rep. Madeleine Dean [D-PA]
Rep. Ed Case [D-HI]Rep. Julia Brownley [D-CA]Rep. Pramila Jayapal [D-WA]Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR]
Rep. Denny Heck [D-WA]Rep. Terri Sewell [D-AL]Rep. Mark DeSaulnier [D-CA]Rep. Amata Radewagen [D-AS]
Rep. Abby Finkenauer [D-IA]Rep. Albio Sires [D-NJ]Rep. Debbie Lesko [R-AZ]Rep. Stephen Lynch [D-MA]
Rep. Anna Eshoo [D-CA]Rep. Rosa DeLauro [D-CT]Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA]Rep. Carolyn Maloney [D-NY]
Rep. Angela Craig [D-MN]Rep. Nydia Velazquez [D-NY]Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL]Rep. Steve Stivers [R-OH]
Rep. Michael Turner [R-OH]Rep. Troy Balderson [R-OH]Rep. Betty McCollum [D-MN]Rep. Kathleen Rice [D-NY]
Rep. Liz Cheney [R-WY]Rep. Kathy Castor [D-FL]Rep. James Himes [D-CT]Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY]
Rep. Brad Sherman [D-CA]Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA]Rep. Jim Cooper [D-TN]Rep. Suzanne Lee [D-NV]
Rep. Ed Perlmutter [D-CO]Rep. Jackie Speier [D-CA]Rep. Josh Harder [D-CA]Rep. Antonio Delgado [D-NY]
Rep. Jenniffer Gonzalez-Colon [R-PR]Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL]Rep. Frederica Wilson [D-FL]Rep. Elissa Slotkin [D-MI]
Rep. Debra Haaland [D-NM]Rep. Jackie Walorski [R-IN]Rep. Debbie Dingell [D-MI]Rep. Gil Cisneros [D-CA]
Rep. Sean Maloney [D-NY]Rep. Ilhan Omar [D-MN]Rep. Susan Brooks [R-IN]Rep. Mike Thompson [D-CA]
Rep. Ayanna Pressley [D-MA]Rep. TJ Cox [D-CA]Rep. Harley Rouda [D-CA]Rep. Lucille Roybal-Allard [D-CA]
Rep. Debbie Mucarsel-Powell [D-FL]Rep. Suzan DelBene [D-WA]Rep. Debbie Wasserman Schultz [D-FL]Rep. Rashida Tlaib [D-MI]
Rep. Cathy McMorris Rodgers [R-WA]Rep. James McGovern [D-MA]Rep. Mark Pocan [D-WI]Rep. Brian Mast [R-FL]
Rep. Earl Carter [R-GA]Rep. Tom Cole [R-OK]Rep. Daniel Lipinski [D-IL]Rep. Joe Courtney [D-CT]
Rep. Tim Ryan [D-OH]Rep. Jerrold Nadler [D-NY]Rep. Adriano Espaillat [D-NY]Rep. Ann Kirkpatrick [D-AZ]
Rep. David Scott [D-GA]Rep. Gregory Meeks [D-NY]Rep. Robert Scott [D-VA]Rep. Andre Carson [D-IN]
Rep. Bill Foster [D-IL]Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL]Rep. Adam Smith [D-WA]Rep. Elise Stefanik [R-NY]
Rep. Ami Bera [D-CA]Rep. Jim Costa [D-CA]Rep. Bobby Rush [D-IL]Rep. Chellie Pingree [D-ME]
Rep. Veronica Escobar [D-TX]Rep. Alexandria Ocasio-Cortez [D-NY]Rep. Joseph Morelle [D-NY]Rep. Don Beyer [D-VA]
Rep. Thomas Suozzi [D-NY]Rep. Tom Malinowski [D-NJ]Rep. Cindy Axne [D-IA]Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA]
Rep. Linda Sanchez [D-CA]Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA]Rep. John Garamendi [D-CA]Rep. Daniel Kildee [D-MI]
Rep. Eliot Engel [D-NY]Rep. David Price [D-NC]Rep. Jose Serrano [D-NY]Rep. Peter Welch [D-VT]
Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA]Rep. Sylvia Garcia [D-TX]Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR]Rep. Henry Cuellar [D-TX]
Rep. Theodore Deutch [D-FL]Rep. Alma Adams [D-NC]Rep. James Langevin [D-RI]Rep. William Keating [D-MA]
Rep. Val Demings [D-FL]Rep. Pete Aguilar [D-CA]Rep. Andy Kim [D-NJ]Rep. Brian Higgins [D-NY]
Rep. Suzanne Bonamici [D-OR]Rep. Tulsi Gabbard [D-HI]Rep. John Larson [D-CT]Rep. Sharice Davids [D-KS]
Rep. John Yarmuth [D-KY]Rep. Vicente Gonzalez [D-TX]Rep. Stephanie Murphy [D-FL]Rep. Conor Lamb [D-PA]
Rep. Josh Gottheimer [D-NJ]Rep. Andy Levin [D-MI]Rep. Luis Correa [D-CA]Rep. Paul Tonko [D-NY]
Rep. C.A. Ruppersberger [D-MD]Rep. Kendra Horn [D-OK]Rep. Anthony Brown [D-MD]Rep. Dean Phillips [D-MN]
Rep. Juan Vargas [D-CA]Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA]Rep. Hakeem Jeffries [D-NY]Rep. Jesus Garcia [D-IL]
Rep. Eddie Johnson [D-TX]Rep. Adam Schiff [D-CA]Rep. Ken Calvert [R-CA]Rep. Elaine Luria [D-VA]
Rep. Seth Moulton [D-MA]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-13HouseBecame Public Law No: 116-330.
2021-01-13HouseSigned by President.
2021-01-01HousePresented to President.
2020-12-31HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2020-12-31HouseOn motion that the House agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to without objection. (text: CR H9172)
2020-12-31HouseMrs. Dingell asked unanimous consent to take the bill, H.R. 1923, from the Speaker's Table and agree to the Senate amendment. (consideration: CR H9172)
2020-12-18SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
2020-12-17SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
2020-12-17SenateS.Amdt.2717 Amendment SA 2717 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
2020-12-17SenateS.Amdt.2717 Amendment SA 2717 proposed by Senator Braun for Senator Cortez Masto. (consideration: CR S7643; text: CR S7643) To improve the bill.
2020-12-17SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S7643)
2020-12-17SenateSenate Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.
2020-09-23SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
2020-09-22HouseThe title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
2020-09-22HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2020-09-22HouseOn passage Passed without objection. (text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR H4707-4708)
2020-09-22HouseH.Amdt.885 On agreeing to the Cleaver amendment (A001) Agreed to without objection.
2020-09-22HouseH.Amdt.885 Amendment (A001) in the nature of a substitute offered by Mr. Cleaver. (consideration: CR H4707-4709; text: CR H4707-4708)
2020-09-22HouseConsidered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H4705-4709)
2020-09-22HouseCommittee on Financial Services discharged.
2020-09-22HouseMr. Cleaver asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider.
2019-03-27HouseReferred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
2019-03-27HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB2427 (Related) 2019-08-01 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
HB6555 (Related) 2020-04-17 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
SB4730 (Related) 2020-09-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback