US HB1926 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes that a national of Liberia shall be deemed to have registered for temporary protected status as of April 1, 2019, for three years, if the national registered for such status at any time and was present in the United States on March 30, 2019, under deferred enforced departure. Temporary protected status is available to nationals of certain designated countries, and such aliens shall have work authorization not be removed from the United States while the status is in effect. Liberia's designation was terminated as of May 21, 2017. The President has granted deferred enforced departure status to Liberian nationals, which prevents their removal from the country and provides work authorization, until March 30, 2020. Individuals with temporary protected status under this bill shall have employment authorization for the three-year period, and any lapse of authorization between April 1, 2019, and the enactment date of this bill shall not affect the validity of such an individual's employment authorization document.
Title
Protect Our Liberian Community Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Dean Phillips [D-MN] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. Tom Malinowski [D-NJ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship. |
2019-03-27 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2019-03-27 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/1926/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr1926/BILLS-116hr1926ih.pdf |