US HB1941 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 51-1)
Status: Engrossed on September 12 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-09-12 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Coastal and Marine Economies Protection Act This bill prohibits the Department of the Interior from offering any tract for oil and gas leasing or preleasing in the Atlantic Outer Continental Shelf planning area (North Atlantic, Mid-Atlantic, South Atlantic, and the Straits of Florida) or the Pacific Outer Continental Shelf planning area (Washington/Oregon, Northern California, Central California, and Southern California).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Coastal and Marine Economies Protection Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-09-11 - House - On passage RC# 525 (Y: 238 N: 189 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-11 - House - On motion to recommit with instructions RC# 524 (Y: 194 N: 233 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-09-11 - House - On agreeing to the Gosar amendment (A007) H.Amdt.612 RC# 523 (Y: 179 N: 252 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-09-11 - House - On agreeing to the Gosar amendment (A002) H.Amdt.607 RC# 522 (Y: 161 N: 272 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-12SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
2019-09-11HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2019-09-11HouseOn passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 238 - 189 (Roll no. 525).
2019-09-11HouseOn motion to recommit with instructions Failed by the Yeas and Nays: 194 - 233 (Roll no. 524).
2019-09-11HouseThe previous question on the motion to recommit with instructions was ordered without objection.
2019-09-11HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Graves (LA) motion to recommit with instructions. The instructions contained in the motion seek to require the bill to be reported back to the House with an amendment to add a new section to the bill that Section 2 of this Act shall take effect on the date the President certifies that the enactment of this Act will not increase the national average price of gasoline.
2019-09-11HouseMr. Graves (LA) moved to recommit with instructions to the Committee on Natural Resources. (text: CR H7636)
2019-09-11HouseThe previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
2019-09-11HouseThe House rose from the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union to report H.R. 1941.
2019-09-11HouseH.Amdt.612 On agreeing to the Gosar amendment (A007) Failed by recorded vote: 179 - 252 (Roll no. 523).
2019-09-11HouseH.Amdt.607 On agreeing to the Gosar amendment (A002) Failed by recorded vote: 161 - 272 (Roll no. 522).
2019-09-11HouseThe House resolved into Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union for further consideration.
2019-09-11HouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H7634-7638)
2019-09-11HouseCommittee of the Whole House on the state of the Union rises leaving H.R. 1941 as unfinished business.
2019-09-11HouseOn motion that the Committe rise Agreed to by voice vote.
2019-09-11HouseMr. Lowenthal moved that the Committe rise.
2019-09-11HouseH.Amdt.613 On agreeing to the Rouda amendment (A008) Agreed to by voice vote.
2019-09-11HouseDEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 548, the Committee of the Whole proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Rouda amendment No. 8.
2019-09-11HouseH.Amdt.613 Amendment (A008) offered by Mr. Rouda. (consideration: CR H7622; text: CR H7622)
2019-09-11HousePOSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on the Gosar amendment, the Chair put the question on the amendment and by voice vote, announced that the noes had prevailed. Mr. Gosar demanded a recorded vote and the Chair postponed further proceedings on agreeing to the amendment until a time to be announced.
2019-09-11HouseDEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 548, the Committee of the Whole proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Gosar amendment No. 7.
2019-09-11HouseH.Amdt.612 Amendment (A007) offered by Mr. Gosar. (consideration: CR H7621-7622, H7635-7636; text: CR H7621)
2019-09-11HouseH.Amdt.611 On agreeing to the Levin (MI) amendment (A006) Agreed to by voice vote.
2019-09-11HouseDEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 548, the Committee of the Whole proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Levin (MI) amendment No. 6.
2019-09-11HouseH.Amdt.611 Amendment (A006) offered by Mr. Levin (MI). (consideration: CR H7619-7621; text: CR H7619)
2019-09-11HouseH.Amdt.610 On agreeing to the Rouda amendment (A005) Agreed to by voice vote.
2019-09-11HouseDEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 548, the Committee of the Whole proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Rouda amendment No. 5.
2019-09-11HouseH.Amdt.610 Amendment (A005) offered by Mr. Rouda. (consideration: CR H7619; text: CR H7619)
2019-09-11HouseH.Amdt.609 On agreeing to the Langevin amendment Agreed to by voice vote.
2019-09-11HouseDEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 548, the Committee of the Whole proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Langevin amendment No. 4.
2019-09-11HouseH.Amdt.609 Amendment (A004) offered by Mr. Langevin. (consideration: CR H7618-7619; text: CR H7618)
2019-09-11HouseH.Amdt.608 On agreeing to the Lesko amendment (A003) Agreed to by voice vote.
2019-09-11HouseDEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H.Res. 548, the Committee of the Whole proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Lesko amendment No. 3.
2019-09-11HouseH.Amdt.608 Amendment (A003) offered by Mrs. Lesko. (consideration: CR H7617-7618; text CR H7617)
2019-09-11HousePOSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on the Gosar amendment, the Chair put the question on the amendment and by voice vote, announced that the noes had prevailed. Mr. Gosar demanded a recorded vote and the Chair postponed further proceedings on agreeing to the amendment until a time to be announced.
2019-09-11HouseDEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H.Res. 548, the Committee of the Whole proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Gosar amendment No. 2.
2019-09-11HouseH.Amdt.607 Amendment (A002) offered by Mr. Gosar. (consideration: CR H7616-7617, H7634-7635; text: CR H7616)
2019-09-11HouseH.Amdt.606 On agreeing to the McClintock amendment (A001) Failed by voice vote.
2019-09-11HouseDEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H.Res. 548, the Committee of the Whole proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the McClintock amendment No. 1.
2019-09-11HouseH.Amdt.606 Amendment (A001) offered by Mr. McClintock. (consideration: CR H7615-7616; text: CR H7615)
2019-09-11HouseGENERAL DEBATE - The Committee of the Whole proceeded with one hour of general debate on H.R. 1941.
2019-09-11HouseHouse resolved itself into the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union pursuant to H. Res. 548 and Rule XVIII.
2019-09-11HouseThe Speaker designated the Honorable Henry Cuellar to act as Chairman of the Committee.
2019-09-11HouseProviding for consideration of H.R. 205, H.R. 1146, and H.R. 1941.
2019-09-11HouseConsidered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 548. (consideration: CR H7606-7622; text: CR H7615)
2019-09-10HouseRule H. Res. 548 passed House.
2019-09-09HouseRules Committee Resolution H. Res. 548 Reported to House. Providing for consideration of H.R. 205, H.R. 1146, and H.R. 1941.
2019-07-16HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 117.
2019-07-16HouseReported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 116-157.
2019-06-19HouseOrdered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 22 - 12.
2019-06-19HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-06-19HouseSubcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources Discharged.
2019-04-02HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
2019-03-28HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources.
2019-03-28HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
2019-03-28HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HR548 (Related) 2019-09-10 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback