US HB1943 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 101-1)
Status: Introduced on March 28 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-04 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Community Health Center and Primary Care Workforce Expansion Act of 2019

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Community Health Center and Primary Care Workforce Expansion Act of 2019

Sponsors

Rep. James Clyburn [D-SC]Rep. Emanuel Cleaver [D-MO]Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL]Rep. Cedric Richmond [D-LA]
Rep. Donald Payne [D-NJ]Rep. Val Demings [D-FL]Rep. Eddie Johnson [D-TX]Rep. Marcia Fudge [D-OH]
Rep. Ilhan Omar [D-MN]Rep. Bonnie Coleman [D-NJ]Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY]Rep. Alma Adams [D-NC]
Rep. Danny Davis [D-IL]Rep. Robert Scott [D-VA]Rep. Bennie Thompson [D-MS]Rep. Marc Veasey [D-TX]
Rep. Hakeem Jeffries [D-NY]Rep. Steven Horsford [D-NV]Rep. Henry Johnson [D-GA]Rep. Karen Bass [D-CA]
Rep. Joyce Beatty [D-OH]Rep. Alexandria Ocasio-Cortez [D-NY]Rep. Eliot Engel [D-NY]Rep. Bobby Rush [D-IL]
Rep. TJ Cox [D-CA]Rep. Ben Lujan [D-NM]Rep. Sanford Bishop [D-GA]Rep. Nanette Barragan [D-CA]
Rep. Tulsi Gabbard [D-HI]Rep. Katie Hill [D-CA]Rep. Jerrold Nadler [D-NY]Rep. Michael San Nicolas [D-GU]
Rep. Tony Cardenas [D-CA]Rep. Albio Sires [D-NJ]Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL]Rep. Elijah Cummings [D-MD]
Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR]Rep. Gil Cisneros [D-CA]Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX]Rep. Frederica Wilson [D-FL]
Rep. Donald McEachin [D-VA]Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC]Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA]Rep. John Lewis [D-GA]
Rep. Brenda Lawrence [D-MI]Rep. Terri Sewell [D-AL]Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN]Rep. Gregorio Sablan [I-MP]
Rep. Lori Trahan [D-MA]Rep. Andre Carson [D-IN]Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL]Rep. Lacy Clay [D-MO]
Rep. Doris Matsui [D-CA]Rep. John Garamendi [D-CA]Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA]Rep. Scott Peters [D-CA]
Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ]Rep. Nydia Velazquez [D-NY]Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI]Rep. Ed Case [D-HI]
Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH]Rep. Seth Moulton [D-MA]Rep. Dwight Evans [D-PA]Rep. Mike Levin [D-CA]
Rep. Lisa Rochester [D-DE]Rep. Max Rose [D-NY]Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA]Rep. Robin Kelly [D-IL]
Rep. Vicente Gonzalez [D-TX]Rep. Brendan Boyle [D-PA]Rep. Filemon Vela [D-TX]Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR]
Rep. Brian Higgins [D-NY]Rep. Ayanna Pressley [D-MA]Rep. Joseph Kennedy [D-MA]Rep. Christopher Pappas [D-NH]
Rep. Angela Craig [D-MN]Rep. Betty McCollum [D-MN]Rep. Adriano Espaillat [D-NY]Rep. Adam Smith [D-WA]
Rep. Jason Crow [D-CO]Rep. Suzanne Bonamici [D-OR]Rep. Jimmy Gomez [D-CA]Rep. G. Butterfield [D-NC]
Rep. Abby Finkenauer [D-IA]Rep. Chellie Pingree [D-ME]Rep. Daniel Lipinski [D-IL]Rep. Dina Titus [D-NV]
Rep. John Yarmuth [D-KY]Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA]Rep. Peter Welch [D-VT]Rep. Susan Davis [D-CA]
Rep. Judy Chu [D-CA]Rep. Debbie Dingell [D-MI]Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA]Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA]
Rep. Lucille Roybal-Allard [D-CA]Rep. Pramila Jayapal [D-WA]Rep. Luis Correa [D-CA]Rep. Jim Cooper [D-TN]
Rep. James Himes [D-CT]Rep. Al Lawson [D-FL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-04HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
2019-03-29HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
2019-03-28HouseReferred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
2019-03-28HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB962 (Related) 2019-04-01 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB192 (Related) 2019-01-18 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HB2700 (Related) 2019-06-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Antitrust, Commercial, and Administrative Law.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback