US HB1947 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-22 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

To amend title 38, United States Code, to exempt transfers of funds from Federal agencies to the Department of Veterans Affairs for nonprofit corporations established under subchapter IV of chapter 73 of such title from certain provisions of the Economy Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To amend title 38, United States Code, to exempt transfers of funds from Federal agencies to the Department of Veterans Affairs for nonprofit corporations established under subchapter IV of chapter 73 of such title from certain provisions of the Economy Act.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-22SenateReceived in the Senate.
2019-05-21HouseSupplemental report filed by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, H. Rept. 116-76, Part II.
2019-05-21HouseThe title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
2019-05-21HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2019-05-21HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4048-4049)
2019-05-21HousePERMISSION TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL - Mr. Takano asked unanimous consent that Committee on the Veterans' Affairs be authorized to file a supplemental report on the bill, H.R. 1947. Agreed to without objection.
2019-05-21HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1947.
2019-05-21HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4048-4051)
2019-05-21HouseMr. Takano moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
2019-05-20HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 52.
2019-05-20HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 116-76.
2019-05-08HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
2019-05-08HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-04-29HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
2019-03-28HouseReferred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
2019-03-28HouseIntroduced in House

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback